EP0826127 - MACHINE LEVELER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2003 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.03.2003 [2003/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states J.P. Bell & Co. 19950 Harper Avenue, P.O. Box 36617 Detroit, MI 48236 / US | [1998/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHRIEVER, Frederick, G. 64 Claireview Road Grosse Pointe Shores, MI 48236 / US | [1998/10] | Representative(s) | Lemke, Jörg-Michael, et al Jung HML Patentanwälte Hofmarkstrasse 10 - Arnhofen 86447 Aindling / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/10] | Lemke, Jörg-Michael, Dipl.-Ing., et al Schmiedstrasse 1, Hausen 86447 Aindling / DE | Application number, filing date | 95920595.6 | 23.05.1995 | [1998/10] | WO1995US06436 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9637729 | Date: | 28.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0826127 | Date: | 04.03.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0826127 | Date: | 20.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.11.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F16M11/04, F16M7/00 | [1998/25] | CPC: |
F16M7/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/10] | F16M11/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, IT [1998/10] | Title | German: | NIVELLIERGERÄT FÜR MASCHINE | [1998/10] | English: | MACHINE LEVELER | [1998/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MISE A NIVEAU POUR MACHINE | [1998/10] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.1997 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.1997 | Search fee paid | 19.11.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 19.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/10] | 09.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.04.2001 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 14.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]FR2090390 (COBUI) [Y] 5 * page 3, line 4 - page 4, line 10; figure 1 * [A] 1,9,11; | [YA]GB2011350 (PFISTER) [Y] 5 * page 1, line 111 - page 2, line 2 * * page 6, line 11 - line 16; figures 6,10 * [A] 1,9,11; | [AD]US1987726 (WILKERSON); | [AD]US3325145 (BERTUCH); | [AD]US5110082 (ROWAN); | [AD]US4858865 (SCHREPFER); | [AD]US2819037 (WILKIN); | [AD]US4114845 (WEISENBERGER) | International search | [A]US3306562 (BELLEFLEUR J PAUL A); | [A]US4436268 (SCHRIEVER FREDERICK G [US]) | by applicant | US1987726 | US2819037 | US3306562 | US3325145 | US4114845 | US4576357 | US4858865 | US5110082 |