EP0760606 - CHEWING GUM HAVING IMPROVED TEXTURE AND CONTAINING MEDIUM CHAIN TRIGLYCERIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2002 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.07.2002 [2002/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WM. WRIGLEY JR. COMPANY 410 North Michigan Avenue Chicago, Illinois 60611 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/11] | For all designated states WM. WRIGLEY JR. COMPANY 410 North Michigan Avenue Chicago Illinois 60611 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUNCZEK, Michael T. 14319 Cottage Grove Dolton, IL 60419 / US | 02 /
MAZZONE, Philip 607 N. Cline Avenue Griffith, IN 46319 / US | 03 /
McGREW, Gordon N. 2505 Ridge Road Evanston, IL 60201 / US | 04 /
URNEZIS, Philip W. 207 E. Prairie Lombard, IL 60148 / US | 05 /
YATKA, Robert J. 151527 St. Andrew Court Orland Park, IL 60462 / US | 06 /
GREENBERG, Michael J. 1633 Brighton Court Northbrook, IL 60062 / US | [1997/11] | Representative(s) | Baverstock, Michael George Douglas, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/11] | Baverstock, Michael George Douglas, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London, EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 95920645.9 | 24.05.1995 | [1997/11] | WO1995US06583 | Priority number, date | WO1994US05771 | 27.05.1994 Original published format: PCT/US94/05771 | US19940346509 | 29.11.1994 Original published format: US 346509 | [1997/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9532637 | Date: | 07.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0760606 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0760606 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.12.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A23G3/30 | [1997/11] | CPC: |
A23G4/066 (EP);
A23G4/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/11] | Title | German: | KAUGUMMI MIT VERBESSERTER BESCHAFFENHEIT, DER MITTELKETTIGE TRIGLYZERIDE ENTHÄLT | [1997/11] | English: | CHEWING GUM HAVING IMPROVED TEXTURE AND CONTAINING MEDIUM CHAIN TRIGLYCERIDES | [1997/11] | French: | CHEWING-GUM A TEXTURE AMELIOREE CONTENANT DES TRIGLYCERIDES A CHAINE MOYENNE | [1997/11] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.1996 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.1996 | Search fee paid | 21.11.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/11] | 14.03.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 07.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]ES2040633 (SIMON FITZIG-NIE) [A] 1,9 * column 3, line 10 - line 29; examples 1,4,5; claim - *; | [PA]US5401496 (FITZIG ET AL.) [PA] 1,9 | International search | [Y]US4378374 ; | [Y]US5156866 ; | [Y]JPS58146241 ; | [Y]US4452820 ; | [A]US4446157 |