EP0766615 - WORM WITH INSERTABLE WORM COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.08.1999 [1999/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krupp Werner & Pfleiderer GmbH Theodorstrasse 10 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [1998/16] |
Former [1997/29] | For all designated states Werner & Pfleiderer GmbH Theodorstrasse 10 70469 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1997/15] | For all designated states Fried. Krupp AG Hoesch-Krupp Postfach 10 22 52 45022 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEIHRICH, Gerhard Einsiedlerweg 7 D-75428 Illingen / DE | 02 /
WÖRZ, Wolfgang Mendelstrasse 15 D-75428 Illingen / DE | 03 /
WUTTKE, Reinhard Dinkelsbühler Strasse 47 D-70374 Stuttgart / DE | 04 /
SAUTER, Rainer Im Greut 5 D-71686 Remseck / DE | [1997/15] | Representative(s) | Rau, Manfred, et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/37] | Rau, Manfred, Dr. Dipl.-Ing., et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [1997/29] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1997/15] | Husmann, Johannes, Dipl.-Ing., et al Fried. Krupp AG Hoesch-Krupp, Patentabteilung, Postfach 10 22 52 45022 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 95920754.9 | 03.06.1995 | [1997/15] | WO1995DE00728 | Priority number, date | DE19944421514 | 20.06.1994 Original published format: DE 4421514 | [1997/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9535195 | Date: | 28.12.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/55] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0766615 | Date: | 09.04.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0766615 | Date: | 19.08.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B29C47/60, B01F15/00, F16D3/06 | [1997/15] | CPC: |
F16D3/06 (EP,US);
B29C48/505 (KR);
B01F27/071 (EP,US);
B29C48/2564 (EP,US);
F16D1/10 (EP);
B29C48/03 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL [1997/15] | Title | German: | SCHNECKENMASCHINE MIT AUFSTECKBAREN SCHNECKENSATZELEMENTEN | [1997/15] | English: | WORM WITH INSERTABLE WORM COMPONENTS | [1997/15] | French: | MACHINE A VIS SANS FIN COMPORTANT DES ELEMENTS HELICOIDAUX EMBOITABLES | [1997/15] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.1997 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/15] | 13.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1264883 (BORG WARNER); | [DA]DE1502337 (WERNER & PFLEIDERER) [DA] 1-3 * figure -; claim . *; | [A]US3998318 (MCALARNEY FRED R) [A] 1-3 * column W *; | [Y]EP0399869 (ECIA EQUIP COMPOSANTS IND AUTO [FR]) [Y] 1-3 * column 2, line 34 - line 51 * * figure 3 *; | [Y]EP0426619 (ICMA IND COSTR MAC AFFINI [IT]) [Y] 1-3 * column 6, line 57 - column 7, line 30 * * figures 1-3 * |