EP0760149 - SHIFT REGISTER USING MIS TRANSISTORS HAVING THE SAME POLARITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2002 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: GB | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON-LCD 173, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [1997/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAURICE, François Thomson Multimedia F-92050 Paris-La Défense / FR | [1997/10] | Representative(s) | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte, et al Technicolor European Patent Operations 1-5 Rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte, et al Thomson multimedia Patent Department 46 Quai A. le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1997/10] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte, et al THOMSON Multimedia, 9 Place des Vosges La Défense 5 92050 Paris La Défense / FR | Application number, filing date | 95920943.8 | 16.05.1995 | [1997/10] | WO1995FR00634 | Priority number, date | FR19940005987 | 17.05.1994 Original published format: FR 9405987 | [1997/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9531804 | Date: | 23.11.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0760149 | Date: | 05.03.1997 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0760149 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/36, G11C19/28 | [1997/10] | CPC: |
G11C19/28 (EP,US);
G09G3/3677 (EP,KR,US);
G09G3/3688 (EP,KR,US);
G09G2300/043 (EP,KR,US);
G09G2310/0286 (EP,KR,US);
G09G2320/0209 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1997/10] | Title | German: | SCHIEBEREGISTER MIT GLEICH POLARISIERTEN MIS-TRANSISTOREN | [1997/10] | English: | SHIFT REGISTER USING MIS TRANSISTORS HAVING THE SAME POLARITY | [1997/10] | French: | REGISTRE A DECALAGE UTILISANT DES TRANSISTORS M.I.S. DE MEME POLARITE | [1997/10] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.1996 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.10.1996 | Examination requested [1997/10] | 14.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 31.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 08.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2013/46] |
Former [2003/01] | GB | 14.11.2001 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9209985 (THOMSON SA [FR]) [A] 1 * page 14, line 13 - page 15, line 9; figure 6 *; | [A]JPS6070599 ; | [A]US4163291 (MORIYA YOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]US4035662 (KUO CHANG-KIANG) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]GB2022953 (HITACHI LTD, et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850828), vol. 9, no. 210, Database accession no. (P - 383)<1933>, & JP60070599 A 00000000 (SEIKO) [A] 1 * abstract * |