EP0769552 - ANTISENSE NUCLEIC ACID COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.01.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.02.2002 [2002/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOAGOSEI CO., LTD. 14-1, Nishishimbashi 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8419 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/17] | For all designated states TOAGOSEI CO., LTD. 14-1, Nishishimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UCHIDA, Kiyoshi Toagosei Co., Ltd. Tsukuba Research Laboratory 2 Okubo Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 300-33 / JP | 02 /
UCHIDA, Takayoshi Toagosei Co., Ltd. Tsukuba Research Laboratory 2 Okubo Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 300-33 / JP | 03 /
TANAKA, Youichi Toagosei Co., Ltd. Tsukuba Research Laboratory 2 Okubo Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 300-33 / JP | 04 /
MATSUDA, Yoko Toagosei Co., Ltd. Tsukuba Research Laboratory 2 Okubo Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 300-33 / JP | 05 /
KONDO, Shinishi Toagosei Co., Ltd. Tsukuba Research Laboratory 2 Okubo Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 300-33 / JP | [1997/17] | Representative(s) | Wilhelms, Rolf E., et al WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/17] | Wilhelms, Rolf E., Dr., et al WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95921109.5 | 07.06.1995 | [1997/17] | WO1995JP01121 | Priority number, date | JP19940145146 | 27.06.1994 Original published format: JP 14514694 | JP19940311130 | 21.11.1994 Original published format: JP 31113094 | [1997/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9600286 | Date: | 04.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0769552 | Date: | 23.04.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.01.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/11, A61K31/70, C07H21/00 | [1997/23] | CPC: |
C12N15/1136 (EP,US);
G01N33/564 (EP,US);
G01N33/57496 (EP,US);
G01N33/74 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C12N2310/315 (EP,US);
G01N2333/475 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1997/17] | C12N15/11, A61K48/00, G01N33/50 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [1997/17] | Title | German: | 'ANTISENSE'NUKLEINSÄURE-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [1997/17] | English: | ANTISENSE NUCLEIC ACID COMPOUND | [1997/17] | French: | COMPOSE D'ACIDE NUCLEIQUE ANTISENS | [1997/17] | Entry into regional phase | 24.12.1996 | Translation filed | 24.12.1996 | National basic fee paid | 24.12.1996 | Search fee paid | 24.12.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.12.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 24.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/17] | 16.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/08] | 27.10.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2001 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO9623065 (HYBRIDON INC [US], et al) [E] 1-12 * SEQ IDs 5,10,12,48,51 * | [OPX] - UCHIDA, K. ET AL., "Selection of antisense oligodeoxyribonucleotides that inhibit VEGF/VPF expression in a cell-free system", ANTISENSE RES.DEV. 5 (SPRING 95);87-8;OP-10, XP002006442 [OPX] 1-3,12 * abstract * | International search | [XP]WO9504142 (HYBRIDON INC [US], et al); | [A]WO9102058 (CALIFORNIA BIOTECHNOLOGY INC [US]) | [A] - NATURE, (1993), Vol. 362, No. 6423, KIM K.J. et al., "Inhibition of Vascular Endothelial Growth Factor-Induced Engiogenesis Suppresses Tumour Growth in-Vivo", pages 841-844. | [A] - BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1993), Vol. 194, No. 3, KONDO S. et al., "Significance of Vascular Endothelial Growth Factor-Vascular Permeability Factor for Solid Tumor Growth and its Inhibition by the Antibody", pages 1234-1241. | [A] - J. BIOL. CHEM., (1991), Vol. 266, No. 18, TISCHER E. et al., "The Human Gene for Vascular Endothelial Growth Factor", pages 11947-11954. |