EP0804730 - AUTOMATED TISSUE ASSAY USING STANDARDIZED CHEMICALS AND PACKAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.09.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.10.1999 [1999/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIOTEK SOLUTIONS, INC. 120-B Cremona Drive Santa Barbara, CA 93117 / US | [1997/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERNSTEIN, Steven, A. 2717 San Marcos Avenue Los Olivos, CA 93441 / US | 02 /
ERICKSON, Page, A. 2505 Calle Montilla Santa Barbara, CA 93109 / US | 03 /
BARKER, Stephen 120-B Cremona Drive Santa Barbara, CA 93109 / US | [1997/45] | Representative(s) | Vossius, Volker, et al ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/45] | Vossius, Volker, Dr., et al Dr. Volker Vossius, Patentanwaltskanzlei - Rechtsanwaltskanzlei, Holbeinstrasse 5 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95921270.5 | 17.05.1995 | [1997/45] | WO1995US06156 | Priority number, date | US19940252282 | 31.05.1994 Original published format: US 252282 | [1997/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9533240 | Date: | 07.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0804730 | Date: | 05.11.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.12.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543, G01N33/00, G01N35/00, G01N35/02, G06F17/40, B01L3/00, H05B3/06, B25J9/16, G05B19/04, G05B19/042 | [1997/45] | CPC: |
B25J9/1679 (EP,US);
B25J9/1671 (EP,US);
G01N1/312 (EP,US);
G01N35/0092 (EP,US);
G01N35/0099 (EP,US);
G01N2035/0093 (EP,US);
G01N2035/1093 (EP,US);
G05B2219/40097 (EP,US);
G05B2219/40098 (EP,US);
G05B2219/40099 (EP,US);
G05B2219/40108 (EP,US);
G05B2219/40113 (EP,US);
G05B2219/40463 (EP,US);
G05B2219/45092 (EP,US);
G05B2219/45118 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/45] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE GEWEBEBESTIMMUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG STANDARDISIERTER CHEMIKALIEN UND ANORDNUNGEN | [1997/45] | English: | AUTOMATED TISSUE ASSAY USING STANDARDIZED CHEMICALS AND PACKAGES | [1997/45] | French: | ANALYSE AUTOMATISEE DE TISSUS A L'AIDE DE PRODUITS CHIMIQUES ET DE CONDITIONNEMENTS NORMALISES | [1997/45] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.1996 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.1996 | Search fee paid | 28.11.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.12.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 28.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/45] | 28.11.1996 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 27.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.1997 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 26.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/43] | 02.06.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4632808 (YAMAMOTO MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,17-48,60,61 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0255026 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [A] 1-3,17-48,60,61 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0275826 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 7,49-59,80-90* the whole document *; | [A]FR2630216 (IBAL [FR]) [A] 1-3,17-48,60,61 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3939850 (HELENA LAB CORP [US]) [A] 1-3,17-48,60,61 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9106050 (APPLIED BIOSYSTEMS [US]) [X] 4-6,62,63 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9119237 (ALLEN BRADLEY CO [US]) [A] 4-6,62,63 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9303451 (BIOTEK SOLUTIONS INC [US]) [A] 1-3,17-48,60,61 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9315407 (RUGGERI GUIDO [DE], et al) [A] 1-3,17-48,60,61 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US4087248 (MILES LAUGHTON E); | [X]US4384193 (KLEDZIK GARY S, et al); | [A]US4495149 (IWATA TOYOTARO [JP], et al); | [A]US4719087 (HANAWAY RICHARD W [US]); | [A]US4727494 (BUOTE WILLIAM J [US]); | [A]US4835711 (HUTCHINS BURLEIGH M [US], et al); | [A]US4843566 (GORDON GARY B [US], et al); | [X]US4929619 (BLACKMAN STEVEN T [US]); | [A]US4952518 (JOHNSON LARRY J [US], et al); | [X]US5016170 (POLLALIS SPIRO N [US], et al); | [Y]US5037484 (SU KAI C [US], et al); | [X]US5225325 (MILLER PHILLIP C [US], et al); | [A]US5229074 (HEATH WARREN J [US], et al); | [X]US5281394 (HOLUB JOHN M [US]); | [AP]US5355304 (DEMORANVILLE VICTORIA E [US], et al) | [X] - J. CHEM. INF. COMPUT. SCI., Vol. 28, No. 4, 1988, T.L. ISENHOUR and P.B. HARRINGTON, "TORTS: An Expert System for Temporal Optimization of Robotic Procedures", pages 215-21. | [X] - REV. SCI. INSTRUM., Vol. 6, No. 6, June 1988, J.S. LINDSEY et al., "Robotic Work Station for Microscale Synthetic Chemistry: On-Line Absorption Spectroscopy, Quantitative Automated Thin-Layer Chromatography and Multiple Reactions in Parallel", pages 940-950. | [A] - HUDSON CONTROL GROUP, INC., SOFTWARE PRODUCT SPECIFICATION, "Total Control for Windows", Data Sources Report, (V. 1.1), December 1994. | [A] - ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, Vol. 54, No. 13, November 1982, G.D. OWENS and R.J. ECKSTEIN, "Robotic Sample Preparation Station", pages 2347-2351. | [A] - HEWLETT-PACKARD JOURNAL, Vol. 44, No. 3, June 1993, G.B. GORDEN et al., "ORCA: Optimized Robot for Chemical Analysis", pages 6(14. |