EP0760975 - GUARDED MEMORY SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.07.2005 [2005/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/11] | For all designated states INTEL CORPORATION 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GILLESPIE, Byron, R. 3730 E. Rockwood Drive Phoenix, AZ 85024 / US | 02 /
GARBUS, Elliot, D. 2700 N. Hayden Road 3106 Scotsdale, AZ 85257 / US | 03 /
KAHN, Mitchell, A. 1535 Boone Drive San Jose, CA 95018 / US | 04 /
JOHNSON, Thomas, M. 701 W. Grove Parkway 186 Tempe, AZ 85283 / US | 05 /
O'CONNOR, Dennis, M. 12130 E. Via de Palmas Chandler, AZ 85249 / US | 06 /
HEEB, Jay, S. 1314 N. Brittany Lane Gilbert, AZ 85234 / US | [1997/11] | Representative(s) | Wombwell, Francis, et al Forresters 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/11] | Wombwell, Francis, et al Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside L41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 95921361.2 | 23.05.1995 | [1997/11] | WO1995US06515 | Priority number, date | US19940249011 | 25.05.1994 Original published format: US 249011 | [1997/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9532460 | Date: | 30.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0760975 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0760975 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.11.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/00, G06F7/00, G06F12/14 | [1997/34] | CPC: |
G06F12/1441 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/11] | G06F3/00, G06F7/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/11] | Title | German: | GESCHÜTZTES SPEICHERSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [1997/11] | English: | GUARDED MEMORY SYSTEM AND METHOD | [1997/11] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE MEMOIRE A ACCES PROTEGE | [1997/11] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.1996 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.1996 | Search fee paid | 18.12.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/11] | 01.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1998 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   26.08.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0331407 (HITACHI MAXELL [JP]) [Y] 1,2,5 * abstract * * column 4, line 2 - line 41 * * column 5, line 39 - column 6, line 15 * * figure 1 * [A] 4,6; | [YA]EP0481735 (ARRAY TECHNOLOGY CORP [US]) [Y] 1,2,5 * abstract * * page 3, line 43 - page 4, line 14 * * page 4, line 36 - line 50 * * figure 1 * [A] 4,6; | [A]EP0540095 (PHILIPS COMPOSANTS [FR], et al) [A] 1,2,4-6 * abstract * * column 7, line 21 - line 26 * * column 8, line 21 - column 9, line 19 * * column 15, line 10 - line 45 *; | [A]JPH02278446 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910204), vol. 015, no. 044, Database accession no. (P - 1161), & JP02278446 A 19901114 (NEC IBARAKI LTD) [A] 1,2,4-6 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US3573855 (CRAGON HARVEY G, et al); | [Y]US4926316 (BAKER PAUL A [US], et al); | [Y]US4488256 (ZOLNOWSKY JOHN E [US], et al); | [Y]US5051889 (FUNG MICHAEL G [US], et al); | [Y]US5097445 (YAMAUCHI NAOKI [JP]) |