EP0763123 - SAFE RETROVIRAL VECTORS, THEIR PRODUCTION AND USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.1998 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.1998 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.10.1998 [1998/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Immunomedics, Inc. 300 American Road Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/12] | For all designated states Immunomedics, Inc. 300 American Road Morris Plains, New Jersey 07950 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEUNG, Shui-on 254 Kings Road Madison, NJ 07940 / US | 02 /
CHANG, Chien-Hsing 349 French Circle Downingtown, PA 19335 / US | [1997/12] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/12] | Mercer, Christopher Paul Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 95921391.9 | 07.06.1995 | [1997/12] | WO1995US06594 | Priority number, date | US19940255771 | 07.06.1994 Original published format: US 255771 | [1997/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9533842 | Date: | 14.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0763123 | Date: | 19.03.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.12.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/86, A61K48/00 | [1997/12] | CPC: |
C12N15/86 (EP);
A61K38/45 (EP);
A61K48/00 (EP);
C12N2740/16043 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1997/12] | Title | German: | SICHERE RETROVIRALE VEKTOREN, IHRE HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [1997/12] | English: | SAFE RETROVIRAL VECTORS, THEIR PRODUCTION AND USE | [1997/12] | French: | VECTEURS RETROVIRAUX SANS DANGER, LEUR PRODUCTION ET UTILISATION | [1997/12] | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.1997 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.1997 | Search fee paid | 03.01.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 03.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/12] | 14.08.1998 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1998/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9102805 (VIAGENE INC) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9205266 (VIAGENE INC) [X] 1-10 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]EP0334301 ; | [Y]WO9007936 ; | [Y]WO9012087 ; | [Y]WO9215693 | [Y] - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., Volume 90, issued August 1993, P. SALMON et al., "Characterization of the Human CD4 Gene Promoter: Transcription From the CD4 Gene Core Promoter is Tissue-Specific and is Activated by Ets Proteins", pages 7739-7743. |