EP0760720 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING STURDY, WEAR-RESISTANT ROTATING WIRE, ROPE AND/OR CABLE RUNNING SURFACES, ESPECIALLY SURFACES OF WIRE DRAWING DRUMS OF WIRE DRAWING MACHINES OR SIMILAR CONVEYOR ROLLERS OR DRUMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.03.1999 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.1999 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.05.1999 [1999/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Leonrodstrasse 54 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/11] | For all designated states FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG E.V. Leonrodstrasse 54 80636 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUSCH, Hans-Günter Loschwitzer Strasse 9 01309 Dresden / DE | 02 /
MORGENTHAL, Lothar, Dr. Gitterseestrasse 7 01187 Dresden / DE | 03 /
POLLACK, Dieter, Dr. Papstdorfer Strasse 39 01277 Dresden / DE | [1997/11] | Application number, filing date | 95921696.1 | 12.06.1995 | [1997/11] | WO1995DE00781 | Priority number, date | DE19944421238 | 17.06.1994 Original published format: DE 4421238 | [1997/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9535173 | Date: | 28.12.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/55] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0760720 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B21C1/14, C21D1/09, C21D9/38 | [1997/11] | CPC: |
B21C1/14 (EP);
C21D1/09 (EP);
C21D9/0068 (EP);
C21D9/08 (EP);
C21D9/563 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, PT, SE [1997/11] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG BEANSPRUCHUNGSGERECHT VERSCHLEISSFESTER, ROTIEREND BEWEGTER DRAHT-, SEIL- UND/ODER DRAHTSEILLAUFFLÄCHEN, INSBESONDERE OBERFLÄCHEN VON DRAHTZIEHTROMMELN AUS DRAHTZIEHMASCHINEN ODER ÄHNLICHEN TRANSPORTROLLEN ODER TROMMELN | [1997/11] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING STURDY, WEAR-RESISTANT ROTATING WIRE, ROPE AND/OR CABLE RUNNING SURFACES, ESPECIALLY SURFACES OF WIRE DRAWING DRUMS OF WIRE DRAWING MACHINES OR SIMILAR CONVEYOR ROLLERS OR DRUMS | [1997/11] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE SURFACES DE SUPPORT POUR FILS, CABLES ET/OU CABLES METALLIQUES, MOBILES EN ROTATION, SOUMISES A DES CONTRAINTES ET RESISTANT A L'USURE, EN PARTICULIER, DE SURFACES DE TAMBOURS DE MACHINES A TREFILER OU DE CYLINDRES OU TAMBOURS ANALOGUES POUR CONVOYEURS | [1997/11] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.1996 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/11] | 19.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.03.1999 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1999/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1998 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   12.08.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE888834 (VEREINIGTE DEUTSCHE METALLWERKE AG) [A] 1 * figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]US4452647 (VAINO SAILAS) [A] 1,2,7 * column 6, line 26 - column 7, line 5 * * column 7, line 35 - column 8, line 50; figure - *; | [A]DE124825 (BERKENHOFF & DREBES) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB901527 (PULLIN) [A] * figure 2 * |