EP0765492 - ELECTRO-OPTICAL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.04.1999 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.05.1999 [1999/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Postfach 41 19 64271 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/14] | For all designated states MERCK PATENT GmbH Postfach 41 19 D-64271 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FINKENZELLER, Ulrich Waldpfad 74 D-68723 Plankstadt / DE | 02 /
BÖHM, Edgar Hausweg 40 D-64347 Griesheim / DE | [1997/14] | Application number, filing date | 95921812.4 | 02.06.1995 | [1997/14] | WO1995EP02096 | Priority number, date | DE19944420585 | 13.06.1994 Original published format: DE 4420585 | [1997/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9534843 | Date: | 21.12.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/54] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0765492 | Date: | 02.04.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1337 | [1997/14] | CPC: |
G02F1/133788 (EP);
G02F1/133711 (EP);
G02F1/133757 (EP);
G02F1/133765 (EP);
G02F1/141 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1997/14] | Title | German: | ELEKTROOPTISCHES SYSTEM | [1997/14] | English: | ELECTRO-OPTICAL SYSTEM | [1997/14] | French: | SYSTEME ELECTRO-OPTIQUE | [1997/14] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.1996 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.10.1996 | Examination requested [1997/14] | 08.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/20] | 17.12.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP0203569 (YOSHINO KATSUMI [JP], et al) [X] 4 * figures 2,4,5; claims 1-3,11 * * idem * [A] 1-3; | [A]EP0445629 (HERCULES INC [US]) [A] 1-3 * page 2, line 38 - line 51 * * page 5, line 51 - page 6, line 36 * * page 7, line 36 - line 47 * * claims 1,2,14,15,17-19 *; | [A]EP0525478 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * page 3, line 23 - line 50 * * figure -; claims 1,4 *; | [AD] - SCHADT M ET AL, "Surface-induced parallel alignment of liquid crystals by linearly polymerized photopolymers", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, PART 1 (REGULAR PAPERS & SHORT NOTES), JULY 1992, JAPAN, ISSN 0021-4922, XP000371722 [AD] 1-3 * siehe Zusammenfassung; Abschnitte 6,7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.31.2155 |