EP0727488 - GLUCAN ELICITOR RECEPTOR AND DNA CODING FOR THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.12.2004 [2004/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIRIN BEER KABUSHIKI KAISHA 10-1, Shinkawa 2-chome Chuo-Ku Tokyo 104 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/34] | For all designated states KIRIN BEER KABUSHIKI KAISHA 10-1, Shinkawa 2-chome Chuo-Ku, Tokyo 104 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIKAWA, Masaaki +di . . / JP | 02 /
KAKITANI, Makoto Kirin Beer K. K. Kiban Gijutsu Kenkyusho ,13-5 Fukuura 1-chome Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 236 / JP | 03 /
UMEMOTO, Naoyuki Kirin Beer K. K. Kiban Gijutsu Kenkyusho 13-5, Fukuura 1-chome Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 236 / JP | 04 /
ISHIDA, Isao Kirin Beer K. K. Kiban Gijutsu Kenkyusho 13-5, Fukuura 1-chome Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shiKanagawa 236 / JP | 05 /
IWAMATSU, Akihiro Kirin Beer K. K. Kiban Gijutsu Kenkyusho 13-5, Fukuura 1-chome Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 236 / JP | 06 /
YOSHIKAWA, Kuniko(Heiress) 1-7-A-9, Kita-24-jyo Nishi-12-chome Kita-ku, Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido 001 / JP | [1996/45] |
Former [1996/34] | 01 /
YOSHIKAWA, Masaaki +di . . / JP | ||
02 /
KAKITANI, Makoto Kirin Beer K. K. Kiban Gijutsu Kenkyusho ,13-5 Fukuura 1-chome Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 236 / JP | |||
03 /
UMEMOTO, Naoyuki Kirin Beer K. K. Kiban Gijutsu Kenkyusho 13-5, Fukuura 1-chome Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 236 / JP | |||
04 /
ISHIDA, Isao Kirin Beer K. K. Kiban Gijutsu Kenkyusho 13-5, Fukuura 1-chome Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shiKanagawa 236 / JP | |||
05 /
IWAMATSU, Akihiro Kirin Beer K. K. Kiban Gijutsu Kenkyusho 13-5, Fukuura 1-chome Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 236 / JP | Representative(s) | Polz, Leo, et al Hoffmann - Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/37] | Polz, Leo, Dr., et al Hoffmann Eitle Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/34] | Kolb, Helga, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patent-und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95921978.3 | 16.06.1995 | [1996/34] | WO1995JP01206 | Priority number, date | JP19940136100 | 17.06.1994 Original published format: JP 13610094 | [1996/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9535371 | Date: | 28.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/55] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0727488 | Date: | 21.08.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.12.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/29, C12N5/10, C07K14/415 | [1999/04] | CPC: |
C07K14/415 (EP);
C07K14/705 (EP);
C12N15/8282 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1996/34] | C12N15/12, C07K14/705, C12N5/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/34] | Title | German: | GLUKAN HERVORRUFENDER REZEPTOR UND DNA FÜR DIESEN KODIEREND | [1996/40] | English: | GLUCAN ELICITOR RECEPTOR AND DNA CODING FOR THE SAME | [1996/34] | French: | RECEPTEUR DE L'ELICITEUR DU GLUCAN ET ADN LE CODANT | [1996/34] |
Former [1996/34] | Durch Glucan Rezeptor und entsprechende DNA | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.1996 | Translation filed | 14.02.1996 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.1996 | Search fee paid | 14.02.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/34] | 17.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/53] | 26.07.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - HAHN M ET AL, "Characterisation of hepta-beta-glucoside elicitor-binding protein(s) in soybean", BIOCHEM. SOC. SYMP., (1994), vol. 60, pages 101 - 112, XP002086101 | International search | [XP]JPH06321995 | [A] - FREY, T. et al., "Affinity Purification and Characterization of a Binding Protein for a Hepta-Beta Glucoside Phytoalexin Elicitor in Soybean", PHYTOCHEMISTRY, (1993), Vol. 32, No. 3, p. 543-550. |