EP0776394 - ENHANCEMENTS IN PULPING WITH DISSOLVED SOLIDS CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2000 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.10.2000 [2000/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ahlstrom Machinery, Inc. Ridge Center Glens Falls, NY 12801-3686 / US | [1997/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PROUGH, J., Robert 39 Elizabeth Lane Queensbury, NY 12804 / US | 02 /
MARCOCCIA, Bruno, S. 3 Coblestone Drive Queensbury, Ny 12804 / US | 03 /
LAAKSO, Richard, O. 22 Oakwood Drive Queensbury, NY 12804 / US | 04 /
LUHRMANN, Carl, L. 29 Lincoln Avenue Glens Falls, NY 12801 / US | [1997/29] |
Former [1997/23] | 01 /
PROUGH, J., Robert 17 Heinrick Circle Queensbury, NY 12804 / US | ||
02 /
MARCOCCIA, Bruno, S. 7C Simione Court South Glens Falls, NY 12803 / US | |||
03 /
LAAKSO, Richard, O. 22 Oakwood Drive Queensbury, NY 12804 / US | |||
04 /
LUHRMANN, Carl, L. 29 Lincoln Avenue Glens Falls, NY 12801 / US | Representative(s) | Pratt, David Martin Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/23] | Pratt, David Martin Withers & Rogers, 4 Dyer's Buildings, Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 95922157.3 | 01.06.1995 | [1997/23] | WO1995US06901 | Priority number, date | US19940291918 | 18.08.1994 Original published format: US 291918 | [1997/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9606217 | Date: | 29.02.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0776394 | Date: | 04.06.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.02.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0776394 | Date: | 03.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | D21C3/02, D21C3/24, D21C3/22 | [1997/23] | CPC: |
D21C3/02 (EP,US);
D21C11/0021 (EP,US);
D21C11/04 (EP,US);
D21C3/022 (EP,US);
D21C3/22 (EP,US);
D21C3/224 (EP,US);
D21C3/24 (EP,US);
D21C7/00 (EP,US);
D21C7/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | SE [1997/23] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTER HOLZAUFSCHLUSS MIT KONTROLLE DER GELÖSTEN FESTSTOFFE | [1999/18] | English: | ENHANCEMENTS IN PULPING WITH DISSOLVED SOLIDS CONTROL | [1997/23] | French: | AMELIORATIONS DE LA REDUCTION DU BOIS EN PATE AVEC CONTROLE DES SOLIDES DISSOUS | [1999/15] |
Former [1997/23] | VERBESSERUNG BEI DEM HOLZAUFSCHLUSS MIT KONTROLLE VON GELÖSTEN FESTSTOFFEN | ||
Former [1997/23] | AMELIORATIONS DE LA REDUCTION DU BOIS EN PATE AVEC ELIMINATION DES SOLIDES DISSOUS | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.1997 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/23] | 11.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.04.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP99107555.7 / EP0937813 | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0476230 (KAMYR INC [US]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0517689 (KAMYR INC [US]) [A] 1,9,10 * the whole document *; | [PDA]WO9425668 (KAMYR INC [US]) [PDA] 1-20 * the whole document * |