EP0764268 - METHODS FOR THE DESALTING OF BIOLOGIC SAMPLES TO ELIMINATE DISTURBANCES IN ISOELECTRIC FOCUSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.06.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.1998 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.08.1998 [1998/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIO-RAD LABORATORIES, INC. 1000 Alfred Nobel Drive Hercules, CA 94547 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/13] | For all designated states BIO-RAD LABORATORIES, INC. 1000 Alfred Nobel Drive Hercules California 94547 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIAO, Jia-li Flogstavagen 33 F:621 S-752 63 Uppsala / SE | 02 /
ZHANG, Rong Flogstavagen 33 F:621 S-752 63 Uppsala / SE | 03 /
SIEBERT, Christopher 60 The Crescent Berkeley, CA 94708 / US | [1997/13] | Representative(s) | West, Alan Harry, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/13] | West, Alan Harry, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 95922256.3 | 06.06.1995 | [1997/13] | WO1995US07278 | Priority number, date | US19940255171 | 07.06.1994 Original published format: US 255171 | [1997/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9533988 | Date: | 14.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0764268 | Date: | 26.03.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.12.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/00, G01N27/447 | [1997/37] | CPC: |
G01N27/44795 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/13] | G01N27/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/13] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ENTSALZEN BIOLOGISCHER PROBEN ZUR ELIMINATION VON ZERSTÖRUNGEN BEI ISOELEKTRISCHER FOKUSSIERUNG | [1997/13] | English: | METHODS FOR THE DESALTING OF BIOLOGIC SAMPLES TO ELIMINATE DISTURBANCES IN ISOELECTRIC FOCUSING | [1997/13] | French: | PROCEDES DE DESSALEMENT D'ECHANTILLONS BIOLOGIQUES POUR ELIMINER LES PERTURBATIONS DANS LE CADRE DE L'ELECTROFOCALISATION | [1997/13] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.1997 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.1997 | Search fee paid | 02.01.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 03.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/13] | 09.06.1998 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1998/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5924240 ; | [A]GB2148326 (SCHLEICHER & SCHUELL GMBH) [A] 1 * page 1, line 19 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840207), vol. 8, no. 117, Database accession no. (P - 277)<1554>, & JP59024240 A 19840531 (SHIMAZU SEISAKUSHO K. K.) [A] 1 * abstract * | International search | [A]US4680201 (HJERTEN STELLAN [SE]); | [A]US4971670 (FAUPEL DANIEL M [FR], et al) |