EP0765143 - FEMALE ANTI-INCONTINENCE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.10.1999 [1999/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Juma, Saad 4389 Corte de la Fonda San Diego California 92130 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/25] | For all designated states Juma, Saad 4389 Corte de la Fonda San Diego, California 92130 / US | ||
Former [1997/14] | For all designated states Juma, Saad Georgia Urology,Suite 200 81 Upper Riverdale Road Riverdale GA 30274 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/14] | Representative(s) | Merkelbach, B. Van Ruysdaellaan 47 2264 TK Leidschendam / NL | [1997/14] | Application number, filing date | 95922276.1 | 07.06.1995 | [1997/14] | WO1995US07340 | Priority number, date | US19940257273 | 09.06.1994 Original published format: US 257273 | [1997/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9533420 | Date: | 14.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0765143 | Date: | 02.04.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/00 | [1997/14] | CPC: |
A61F2/0009 (EP,US);
Y10S128/25 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/14] | Title | German: | INKONTINENZVORRICHTUNG FÜR FRAUEN | [1997/14] | English: | FEMALE ANTI-INCONTINENCE DEVICE | [1997/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF ANTI-INCONTINENCE POUR FEMMES | [1997/14] | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.1997 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.1997 | Search fee paid | 03.01.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/14] | 31.12.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/42] | 18.03.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1999/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1997 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   16.12.1997 | 30.06.1998 | 04   M06   Not yet paid | 30.06.1999 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO9324075 (RAM MICHAEL J [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7-26 * the whole document * [A] 6,27; | [X]US4474182 (REA HERMAN [US], et al) [X] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]DE854993 (BIBO HELMUT) [X] 1 * page 2, line 38 - line 67; figure - *; | [A]US3927672 (GARCIA FE); | [A]DE3613696 (CHYTRY EDMUND); | [A]US4809871 (ANGELCHIK JEAN P [US]); | [A]WO8401097 (RICHARDS EDWARD) |