EP0772562 - BAG SEPARATOR AND DISPENSER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.10.2000 [2000/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sealed Air Corporation Park 80 Plaza East Saddle Brook New Jersey 07663-5291 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/20] | For all designated states SEALED AIR CORPORATION Park 80 Plaza East Saddle Brook New Jersey 07663-5291 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORRIS, Joseph W. 305 Kings Place Hartsville, SC 29550 / US | [1997/20] | Representative(s) | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith, London W6 0LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/20] | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 95922280.3 | 09.06.1995 | [1997/20] | WO1995US07352 | Priority number, date | US19940279912 | 25.07.1994 Original published format: US 279912 | [1997/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9603338 | Date: | 08.02.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0772562 | Date: | 14.05.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0772562 | Date: | 10.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B65H35/00, B65D33/00 | [1997/20] | CPC: |
B65D33/002 (EP,US);
B65H35/008 (EP,US);
B65H35/10 (EP,US);
A47F2009/044 (EP,US);
Y10T225/321 (EP,US);
Y10T225/393 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/20] | Title | German: | BEUTELTRENNVORRICHTUNG UND -SPENDER | [1997/20] | English: | BAG SEPARATOR AND DISPENSER | [1997/20] | French: | SEPARATEUR ET DISTRIBUTEUR DE SACHETS | [1997/20] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.1997 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/20] | 02.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 26.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 29.04.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB518138 (ALFRED LEBRECHT, et al) [A] 9* the whole document *; | [A]US3062424 (STIRRUP FRANK A) [A] 9 * column W *; | [DA]US5135146 (SIMHAEE EBRAHIM [US]) [DA] 1-8,16-26 * column W *; | [DA]US5219424 (SIMHAEE EBRAHIM [US]) [DA] 1-8,16-26 * column W *; | [XA]US5261585 (SIMHAEE EBRAHIM [US]) [X] 9 * the whole document * [A] 10-15; | [A]EP0569641 (SONOCO PRODUCTS CO [US]) [A] 1-8,16-26 * column W * |