EP0764041 - BINDING FOR SNOWBOARD ALLOWING FAST FITTING AND REMOVAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.07.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.1999 | Refusal of application | published on 08.09.1999 [1999/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FINIEL, Rémi 8, allée de la Falaise F-13620 Carry-le-Rouet / FR | [1997/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/13] | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/13] | Rinuy, Santarelli 14, avenue de la Grande Armée, B.P. 237 75822 Paris Cédex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 95922575.6 | 07.06.1995 | [1997/13] | WO1995FR00742 | Priority number, date | FR19940006958 | 07.06.1994 Original published format: FR 9406958 | [1997/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9533534 | Date: | 14.12.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0764041 | Date: | 26.03.1997 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A63C9/08 | [1997/13] | CPC: |
A63C10/045 (EP);
A63C10/04 (EP);
A63C10/06 (EP);
A63C10/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, FR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1997/13] | Title | German: | BINDUNG FÜR SNOWBOARD WELCHE SCHNELLE SCHLIESSUNG UND ÖFFNUNG ERMÖGLICHT | [1997/13] | English: | BINDING FOR SNOWBOARD ALLOWING FAST FITTING AND REMOVAL | [1997/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION POUR PLANCHE A NEIGE A CHAUSSAGE ET DECHAUSSAGE RAPIDE | [1997/13] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.1996 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/13] | 05.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.04.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1999/36] | 19.04.1999 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1999/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1997 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   17.11.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE9113766U (TAKE OFF PRODUCTION AG) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]FR2631843 (BATAILLE) [AD] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US4979760 (DERRAH) |