EP0766901 - INTRA-CELL HANDOVER WITH ANTENNA ARRAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 18.04.2007 [2007/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/44] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 16483 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1997/15] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON 126 25 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FORSSEN, Ulf, Göran Toppvägen 6 S-132 39 Saltsjö-Boo / SE | 02 /
GUDMUNDSON, Björn, Olof Orsavägen 13 S-191 71 Sollentuna / SE | [1997/15] | Representative(s) | Hägglund, Mats O. Ericsson AB Patent Unit Radio Networks 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/24] | Hägglund, Mats O. Ericsson AB Patent Unit Radio Networks 164 80 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2002/38] | Sjöberg, Mats Hakan Ericsson AB Patent Unit Radio Access SE-164 80 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2001/41] | Lövgren, Tage, et al Ericsson Radio Systems AB, Patent Support, Legal Matters Radio Systems and Technology 164 80 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2001/16] | Wennerholm, Kristian, et al Ericsson Radio Systems AB, Patent Unit Radio Access 164 80 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2001/12] | Wennerholm, Kristian, et al Ericsson Radio Systems AB Common Patent Department 164 80 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1998/29] | Norin, Klas, et al Ericsson Radio Systems AB Common Patent Department KI/ERA/JT/P 164 80 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1997/15] | Norin, Klas, et al Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson Patent and Trademark Department 126 25 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 95922866.9 | 21.06.1995 | [1997/15] | WO1995SE00764 | Priority number, date | US19940264303 | 23.06.1994 Original published format: US 264303 | [1997/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9600484 | Date: | 04.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0766901 | Date: | 09.04.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0766901 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 04.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/36, H04Q7/38 | [1997/15] | CPC: |
H04W36/06 (EP,US);
H04W16/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1997/15] | Title | German: | WEITERREICHEN INNERHALB EINER ZELLE MIT GRUPPENANTENNE | [1997/15] | English: | INTRA-CELL HANDOVER WITH ANTENNA ARRAYS | [1997/15] | French: | COMMUTATION INTRA-CELLULE AVEC DES RESEAUX D'ANTENNES | [1997/15] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.1996 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 19.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/15] | 08.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 27.01.2005 | [2007/16] | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9312590 (ARRAYCOMM INC [US]); | [AP]EP0616481 (NEC CORP [JP]); | [AP]WO9502307 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) | [AP] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY, Volume 43, No. 3, August 1994, WILIIAM C.Y. LEE, "Applying the Intelligent Cell Concept to PCS". |