EP0830679 - RATE n/(n+1) CODE FOR EMBEDDED SERVO ADDRESS ENCODING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2000 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.10.2000 [2000/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY, INC. 920 Disc Drive, P.O. Box 66360 Scotts Valley California 95067-0360 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/13] | For all designated states SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY, INC. 920 Disc Drive, P.O. Box 66360 Scotts Valley, California 95067-0360 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VOLZ, LeRoy, Allen 11922 Doral Avenue Northridge, CA 91326 / US | 02 /
VARANASI, Chandra, Chuda 311 Country Club Drive 4 Simi Valley, CA 93065 / US | 03 /
STONE, Dennis, Carl 3630 St. Elizabeth Road Glendale, CA 91209 / US | [1998/13] | Representative(s) | Kenyon, Sarah Elizabeth, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/13] | Kenyon, Sarah Elizabeth, et al Orchard Kenyon & Co. Staple Inn Buildings North High Holborn London WC1V 7PZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 95922872.7 | 07.06.1995 | [1998/13] | WO1995US06255 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9641342 | Date: | 19.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/55] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0830679 | Date: | 25.03.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0830679 | Date: | 20.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G11B21/08, G11B27/30 | [1998/13] | CPC: |
G11B27/3027 (EP);
G11B21/08 (KR);
G11B21/083 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1998/13] | Title | German: | N(N+1) KODE RATE FÜR EINGEBETTETE SERVOADRESSKODIERUNG | [1998/13] | English: | RATE n/(n+1) CODE FOR EMBEDDED SERVO ADDRESS ENCODING | [1998/13] | French: | CODE A RAPPORT n/(n+1) POUR LE CODAGE D'ADRESSES D'ASSERVISSEMENT INTEGREES | [1998/13] | Entry into regional phase | 24.12.1997 | National basic fee paid | 24.12.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.12.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/13] | 02.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 01.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 22.04.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]US5274510 (SUGITA JUNKICHI [JP], et al) [AD] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0517230 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-19 * column 2, line 29 - column 3, line 8; figures 3,5 *; | [A]US5270878 (KAIDA KATSUHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-19 * column W *; | [A]DE3923165 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-19 * column 1 - column 3; figures 11,12,14 * | [A] - ANONYMOUS, "Dicell Gray Coding of Disk File Track Addresses. July 1982.", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, NEW YORK, US, vol. 25, no. 2, pages 776 - 777 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * |