EP0763046 - DNA ENCODING GLS1 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.11.2007 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/12] | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EL-SHERBEINI, Mohamed 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | 02 /
CLEMAS, Joseph, A. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | [1997/12] | Representative(s) | Horgan, James Michael Frederic, et al Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 120 Moorgate London, EC2M 6UR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/48] | Horgan, James Michael Frederic, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Merck Sharp & Dohme Limited, Hertford Road, Hoddesdon Hertfordshire, EN11 9BU / GB | ||
Former [2004/27] | Horgan, James Michael Frederic, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | ||
Former [1997/12] | Thompson, John Dr., et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 95922883.4 | 22.05.1995 | [1997/12] | WO1995US06557 | Priority number, date | US19940249420 | 26.05.1994 Original published format: US 249420 | [1997/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9532982 | Date: | 07.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0763046 | Date: | 19.03.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.12.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/00, C12N9/10, C12N1/20, C12N1/16, C12N1/14, C12P21/06, C07H19/00, C07H21/00, C07H21/02, C07H21/04 | [1999/20] | CPC: |
C12N9/1051 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/12] | C07H19/00, C07H21/00, C07H21/02, C07H21/04, C12P21/06, C12N9/10, C12N1/20, C12N1/14, C12N1/16, C12N15/00, C12N15/09 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1997/12] | Title | German: | FÜR GLS1 KODIERENDE DNS | [1997/12] | English: | DNA ENCODING GLS1 | [1997/12] | French: | ADN CODANT POUR LE GENE 1 DE SYNTHESE DU GLUCANE | [1997/12] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.1996 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.1996 | Search fee paid | 27.12.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/12] | 24.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 20.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.01.2007 | 17.01.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 29.01.2007 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 09.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/50] | 24.07.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2007/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2007 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2639230 (PASTEUR INSTITUT [FR]) [X] 12,13 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9113988 (UNIV TEXAS [US]) [X] 1,4-8,14,15 * the whole document *; | [A]US5194600 (BUSSEY HOWARD [CA], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO9510625 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [PX] 1,4-8,11-15 * the whole document * | [X] - WICKSTEED B. ET AL., "The complete sequence of a 7.5 kb rgion of chromosome III from saccharomyces cerevisiae that lies between CRY1 and MAT", YEAST, (1991), vol. 7, no. 7, pages 761 - 772, XP002098180 [X] 1-3 * see esp. figure 3, ORF YCR521 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/yea.320070711 | [X] - ROEMER T. AND BUSSEY H., "Yeast beta-glucan synthesis: KRE6 encodes a predicted type II membrane protein required for glucan synthesis in vivo and for glucan synthase activity in vitro", PNAS,U.S.A., (199112), vol. 88, no. 24, pages 11295 - 11299, XP002098181 [X] 1,4-8,11-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.88.24.11295 | International search | [A] - MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, Vol. 14, No. 2, issued February 1994, HONG et al., "Cloning and Characterization of KNR4, a Yeast Gene Involved in (1,3)-b-Glucan Synthesis", pages 1017-1025. |