EP0717798 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR POLYMERISING BINDERS IN FIBROUS MATERIALS ESPECIALLY MINERAL WOOL INSULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.05.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.1998 | Change - representative | published on 30.09.1998 [1998/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISOVER SAINT-GOBAIN 18, avenue d'Alsace F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | [1996/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MERTZ, Frédéric 16, rue Marcel-Sembat F-93350 Le Bourget / FR | 02 /
CHARTIER, Pascal Bâtiment 6, 45, boulevard Dubrenil F-91400 Orsay / FR | 03 /
DECKER, Christian 3, rue de l'Abattoir F-68170 Rixheim / FR | [1996/26] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/40] | R.A. KUHNEN & P.A. WACKER Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [1996/26] | KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 D-85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 95923332.1 | 16.06.1995 | [1996/26] | WO1995EP02325 | Priority number, date | DE19944421254 | 17.06.1994 Original published format: DE 4421254 | [1996/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9535402 | Date: | 28.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/55] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0717798 | Date: | 26.06.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | D04H1/64, D06M10/00 | [1996/26] | CPC: |
D04H1/655 (EP);
D04H1/587 (KR);
B29C35/0288 (EP);
B29C35/08 (EP);
B29C67/248 (EP);
C08F2/48 (EP);
D04H1/4209 (EP,KR);
D04H1/554 (EP);
D04H1/645 (KR);
B29C2035/0827 (EP);
B29K2063/00 (EP);
B29K2105/0854 (EP);
B29K2503/04 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1996/26] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR POLYMERISATION VON BINDEMITTELN IN FASRIGEN MATERIALIEN INSBESONDERE GLASWOLLE | [1996/26] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR POLYMERISING BINDERS IN FIBROUS MATERIALS ESPECIALLY MINERAL WOOL INSULATION | [1996/26] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE POLYMERISATION D'AGENTS DE LIAISON DANS DES MATERIAUX FIBREUX, NOTAMMENT DANS DE LA LAINE MINERALE D'ISOLATION | [1996/26] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.1996 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/26] | 03.01.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/26] | 30.01.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1998/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1997 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2124691 (IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES) [X] 11* page 5; claim - *; | [X]DE2937081 (UNISEARCH LTD) [X] 1,11 * claim -; tables 14,17 *; | [DY]US5275874 (BRANDENBURG KATHRYN L [US], et al) [DY] 1,3 * the whole document * | [Y] - M MARSMAN ET AL, "PIGMENTIERTE UV-HÄRTENDE BESCHICHTUNGEN FÜR TEXTILANWENDUNGEN", MELLIAND TEXTILBERICHTE, HEIDELBERG DE, vol. 74, no. 5, pages 428 - 434 [Y] 1,3 * page 432 * |