EP0769055 - VARIANTS OF LEUKEMIA INHIBITORY FACTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.06.2000 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.08.2000 [2000/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANCER RESEARCH CAMPAIGN TECHNOLOGY LTD. Cambridge House 6-10 Cambridge Terrace Regent's Park London NW1 4JL / GB | [1997/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREY, Laura, Mary Apartment 1102 117 Gerrard Street East Toronto M5R 2K8 / CA | 02 /
STAUNTON, David 2 The Orchard Badswell Lane Appleton Oxford OX13 5LF / GB | 03 /
HUDSON, Keith, Ronald 14 Northmoor Road Oxford OX2 6UP / GB | 04 /
HEATH, John, Kaye 375 Woodstock Road Oxford OX2 8AA / GB | [1997/17] | Representative(s) | Sexton, Jane Helen, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/17] | Sexton, Jane Helen, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 95923449.3 | 30.06.1995 | [1997/17] | WO1995GB01528 | Priority number, date | GB19940013316 | 01.07.1994 Original published format: GB 9413316 | [1997/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9601319 | Date: | 18.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0769055 | Date: | 23.04.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/24, C12N1/21, C07K16/24, A61K38/20, C07K14/54, C07K14/475, C07K14/52 | [1997/17] | CPC: |
C07K14/52 (EP);
C07K14/475 (EP);
C07K14/54 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP);
C07K2319/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1997/17] | Title | German: | VARIANTEN VON LEUKAEMIE-HEMMENDEN-FAKTOR | [1997/17] | English: | VARIANTS OF LEUKEMIA INHIBITORY FACTOR | [1997/17] | French: | VARIANTES DU FACTEUR INHIBITEUR DE LA LEUCEMIE | [1997/17] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.1996 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/17] | 01.01.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/32] | 03.02.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2000/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1997 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.08.1997 | 30.06.1999 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PXA]WO9418236 (AMRAD CORPORATION LIMITED) [PX] 1,2,4,18 * the whole document * [PA] 6-10 | [XDA] - C.M. OWCZAREK ET AL, "Inter-species chimeras of Leukaemia Inhibitory Factor define a major human receptor-binding determinant", EMBO JOURNAL, EYNSHAM, OXFORD GB, vol. 12, no. 9, pages 3487 - 3495 [XD] 1 * the whole document * [A] 4,6,9,18 | [A] - M. VAN DAM ET AL, "Structure-function analysis of interleukin-6 utilizing Human/murine chimeric molecules", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, MD US, (19930715), vol. 268, no. 20, pages 15285 - 15290 | [A] - M. J. LAYTON ET AL, "Cross-species receptor binding characteristics of human and mouse Leukemia inhibitory factor suggest a complex binding reaction", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY (MICROFILMS), MD US, (19940624), vol. 269, no. 25, pages 17048 - 17055 [A] 1,4,6,9,18 * the whole document * | [DXP] - R.C. ROBINSON ET AL, "The crystal structure and biological function of Leukaemia Inhibitory Factor : Implications for Receptor binbing", CELL, NA US, (19940701), vol. 77, pages 1101 - 1116 [DXP] 1-19 * the whole document * |