EP0759772 - TRI-, TETRA-, PENTA-, AND POLYPEPTIDES AND THEIR THERAPEUTIC USE AS AN ANTIDEPRESSANT AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2005 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 16.03.2005 [2005/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INNAPHARMA, INC. 400 Rella Boulevard, Suite 200 Suffern, NY 10901 / US | [2000/05] |
Former [1997/10] | For all designated states INNAPHARMA, INC. 75 Montebello Road Suffern, NY 10901 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABAJIAN, Henry B. 78 Plymouth Road Hillsdale, NJ 07642 / US | 02 /
NOBLE, John F. 67 Halley Drive Pomona, NY 10970 / US | 03 /
HLAVKA, Joseph J. Tower Hill Road Tuxedo Park, NY 10987 / US | [1997/10] | Representative(s) | Olgemöller, Luitgard Maria, et al Leonhard & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 09 62 80083 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/10] | Olgemöller, Luitgard, Dr., et al Leonhard - Olgemöller - Fricke, Patentanwälte, Josephspitalstrasse 7 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95923659.7 | 02.05.1995 | [1997/10] | WO1995US05560 | Priority number, date | US19940238089 | 04.05.1994 Original published format: US 238089 | [1997/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9530430 | Date: | 16.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0759772 | Date: | 05.03.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0759772 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.11.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/05, A61K38/06, A61K38/07, A61K38/08, C07K5/078, C07K5/097, C07K5/107, C07K5/117, C07K7/06, C07K5/10 | [1999/15] | CPC: |
C07K7/06 (EP,US);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/26 (EP);
C07K5/0821 (EP,US);
C07K5/0823 (EP,US);
C07K5/1016 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1997/10] | A61K38/05, A61K38/06, A61K38/07, A61K38/08, C07K5/078, C07K5/097, C07K5/107, C07K5/117, C07K7/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/10] | Title | German: | TRI-, TETRA-, PENTA- UND POLYPEPTIDE UND IHRE THERAPEUTISCHE VERWENDUNG ALS ANTIDEPRESSIVA | [1997/10] | English: | TRI-, TETRA-, PENTA-, AND POLYPEPTIDES AND THEIR THERAPEUTIC USE AS AN ANTIDEPRESSANT AGENT | [1997/10] | French: | TRI-, TETRA-, PENTA- ET POLYPEPTIDES ET LEUR USAGE THERAPEUTIQUE EN TANT QU'AGENT ANTIDEPRESSEUR | [1997/10] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.1996 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.1996 | Search fee paid | 04.12.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 04.12.1996 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/10] | 30.04.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 09.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.1999 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 17.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 07.10.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 12.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2003 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   07.11.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | MC | 31.05.2004 | [2005/11] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0665287 ; | [A]US4278595 (CORT JOSEPH H); | [X] - J. ERCHEGYI ET AL, "Structure-activity relationships of analogs of the endogenous brain peptides Tyr-MIF-1 and Tyr-W-MIF-1", PEPT. RES., (199301), vol. 6, no. 1, pages 31 - 38, XP002093922 [X] 1,2,33 * table 1 * | [X] - A.J. KASTIN ET AL., "Tyr-MIF-1, identified in brain tissues, and its analogs are active in two models of antinociception", PHARMACOL. BIOCHEM. BEHAV., (1985), vol. 23, no. 6, pages 1045 - 1049, XP000577691 [X] 1,33 * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0091-3057(85)90112-1 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940613), vol. 018, no. 307, Database accession no. (C - 1211), & JP06065287 A 19940308 (NISSHIN FLOUR MILLING CO LTD) [X] 8,33 * abstract * | [A] - J. ERCHEGYI ET AL., "Isolation of a novel tetrapeptide with opiate and antiopiate activity from human brain cortex: Tyr-W-MIF-1", PEPTIDES, (1992), vol. 13, no. 4, pages 623 - 631, XP002093923 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0196-9781(92)90165-Y | International search | [X]US3821188 (MC KINLEY W, et al); | [X]US4018912 (FAILLI AMEDEO, et al); | [X]JPS57108053 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND); | [Y]US4610817 (ALBRECHT HANS P [DE], et al) | [X] - HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA, Volume 44, Numbers 14-15, issued 1961, JAQUENOUD et al., "Synthese de la Lleu8-Oxytocine et de la Val8-Oxytocine, Deux Analgues de L'Oxytocine Modifies Dans La Chaine Laterale", pages 113-122. | [X] - FEBS LETTERS, Volume 37, Number 1, issued November 1973, DESLAURIERS et al., "Intramolecular Motion in Peptides Determined by 13C NMR: A Spin-Lattice Relaxation Time-Study on MSH-Release-Inhibiting Factor", pages 27-32. | [X] - JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, Volume 82, issued 20 March 1960, STUDER et al., "Synthetic Work Related to Arginine-Vasopressin", pages 1499-1501. | [X] - INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PEPTIDE AND PROTEIN RESEARCH, Volume 10, issued 1977, FELIX et al., "Synthesis, Biological Activity and Tritiation of L-3, 4-Dehydroproline-Containing Peptides", pages 299-310. | [X] - COLLECTION OF CZECHOSLOVAK CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS, Volume 53, issued 1988, REISSMANN et al., "Peptide Inhibitors of the Angiotensin Converting Enzyme With Nonproteinogenic Amino Acids", pages 2591-2598. | [X] - FEBS LETTERS, Volume 27, Number 2, issued November 1972, CELIS et al., "Structure-Activity Studies of MSH-Release-Inhibiting Hormone", pages 327-330. | [A] - THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, Volume 264, Number 4, issued 05 February 1989, HORVATH et al., "Isolation of Tyrosine-Melanocyte-Stimulating Hormone Release-Inhibiting Factor 1 from Bovine Brain Tissue", pages 2175-2179. | Examination | US3708593 |