EP0766624 - POLYESTER INSULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RTICA, Inc 999 Barton Street, Stoney Creek Ontario L8E 5H4 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2000/43] | For all designated states RTICA, Inc 999 Barton Street Stoney Creek, Ontario L8E 5H4 / CA | ||
Former [1997/15] | For all designated states E2 Development Corporation 309-5080 Pinedale Avenue Burlington, Ontario L7L 5V7 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beck, Martin H. 23 Standish Way Amherst, NH 03031 / US | 02 /
Rollend, George F. 38 Green Road Amherst, NH 03031 / US | 03 /
Reed, Lydia K. 26 Standish Way Amherst, NH 03031 / US | 04 /
Watson, Marshall Tredway 1700 Long View Street Kingsport, TE 37660 / US | 05 /
Arsenau, David Warren 309-5080 Pinedale Burlington, Ontario L7L 7V7 / CA | [1997/15] | Representative(s) | Watts, Peter Graham Anthony Cundy & Co. 39/41 South Drive Sutton Coldfield West Midlands B75 7TE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/15] | Watts, Peter Graham Anthony Cundy & Co., 1623 Warwick Road Knowle, Solihull, West Midlands B93 9LF / GB | Application number, filing date | 95923664.7 | 25.05.1995 | [1997/15] | WO1995US06467 | Priority number, date | US19940250712 | 26.05.1994 Original published format: US 250712 | [1997/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9532859 | Date: | 07.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0766624 | Date: | 09.04.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0766624 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.12.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B32B5/06, B32B5/22, B32B27/00, D01D5/12, D04H1/58, D04H1/54, D04H1/56, B32B5/26, D01D5/098, E04B1/62, E04D13/16 | [1999/08] | CPC: |
B32B5/26 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (US);
B32B27/36 (US);
B32B37/153 (US);
B32B5/022 (US);
D01D5/0985 (EP,US);
D04H1/54 (EP,US);
D04H1/56 (EP,US);
B32B2250/20 (US);
B32B2262/0276 (US);
B32B2305/20 (US);
B32B2307/304 (US);
B32B2367/00 (US);
Y10S428/904 (EP,US);
Y10S428/913 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1997/15] | B32B5/06, B32B5/22, B32B27/00, D01D5/12, D04H1/58 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/15] | Title | German: | POLYESTER-ISOLATION | [1997/15] | English: | POLYESTER INSULATION | [1997/15] | French: | ISOLATION EN POLYESTER | [1997/15] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.1996 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.1996 | Search fee paid | 29.11.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/15] | 16.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.06.2002 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   04.06.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.07.2004 | BE | 28.07.2004 | CH | 28.07.2004 | FR | 28.07.2004 | IT | 28.07.2004 | LI | 28.07.2004 | NL | 28.07.2004 | DK | 28.10.2004 | GR | 28.10.2004 | SE | 28.10.2004 | DE | 29.10.2004 | ES | 08.11.2004 | PT | 28.12.2004 | [2008/06] |
Former [2006/32] | AT | 28.07.2004 | |
BE | 28.07.2004 | ||
CH | 28.07.2004 | ||
FR | 28.07.2004 | ||
LI | 28.07.2004 | ||
NL | 28.07.2004 | ||
DK | 28.10.2004 | ||
GR | 28.10.2004 | ||
SE | 28.10.2004 | ||
DE | 29.10.2004 | ||
ES | 08.11.2004 | ||
Former [2006/24] | AT | 28.07.2004 | |
BE | 28.07.2004 | ||
CH | 28.07.2004 | ||
LI | 28.07.2004 | ||
NL | 28.07.2004 | ||
DK | 28.10.2004 | ||
GR | 28.10.2004 | ||
SE | 28.10.2004 | ||
DE | 29.10.2004 | ||
ES | 08.11.2004 | ||
Former [2006/03] | AT | 28.07.2004 | |
BE | 28.07.2004 | ||
CH | 28.07.2004 | ||
LI | 28.07.2004 | ||
DK | 28.10.2004 | ||
GR | 28.10.2004 | ||
SE | 28.10.2004 | ||
DE | 29.10.2004 | ||
ES | 08.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | AT | 28.07.2004 | |
BE | 28.07.2004 | ||
CH | 28.07.2004 | ||
LI | 28.07.2004 | ||
DK | 28.10.2004 | ||
GR | 28.10.2004 | ||
SE | 28.10.2004 | ||
ES | 08.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 28.07.2004 | |
CH | 28.07.2004 | ||
LI | 28.07.2004 | ||
DK | 28.10.2004 | ||
GR | 28.10.2004 | ||
SE | 28.10.2004 | ||
ES | 08.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 28.07.2004 | |
CH | 28.07.2004 | ||
LI | 28.07.2004 | ||
DK | 28.10.2004 | ||
GR | 28.10.2004 | ||
SE | 28.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT | 28.07.2004 | |
CH | 28.07.2004 | ||
LI | 28.07.2004 | ||
GR | 28.10.2004 | ||
SE | 28.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 28.07.2004 | |
GR | 28.10.2004 | ||
SE | 28.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 28.07.2004 | |
SE | 28.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 28.10.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US4118531 (HAUSER EDWARD R); | [Y]US5075068 (MILLIGAN MANCIL W [US], et al); | [Y]US5236771 (GROSHENS PIERRE [FR]); | [Y]US5298321 (ISODA HIDEO [JP], et al) |