EP0764383 - MEDIATION OF TRAFFIC IN AN ADVANCED INTELLIGENT NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BellSouth Intellectual Property Corporation 824 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | [2002/11] |
Former [1997/13] | For all designated states BELLSOUTH CORPORATION 1155 Peachtree Street, N.E. Atlanta, Georgia 30367-6000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEISSER, Frank, J., Jr. 6780 Hunters Trace Circle Atlanta, GA 30328 / US | [1997/13] | Representative(s) | Chettle, Adrian John, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/13] | Chettle, Adrian John, et al Withers & Rogers 4, Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 95923705.8 | 05.06.1995 | [1997/13] | WO1995US07077 | Priority number, date | US19940254590 | 06.06.1994 Original published format: US 254590 | [1997/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9535633 | Date: | 28.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/55] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0764383 | Date: | 26.03.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0764383 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q3/00 | [1997/13] | CPC: |
H04M3/4228 (EP,US);
H04Q3/0045 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13515 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13522 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13526 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13533 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1997/13] | Title | German: | VERKEHRSVERMITTLUNG IN EINEM VERBESSERTEN INTEGRIERTEN NETZWERK | [1997/13] | English: | MEDIATION OF TRAFFIC IN AN ADVANCED INTELLIGENT NETWORK | [1997/13] | French: | PASSERELLE D'ECHANGE DE PAQUETS DE DONNEES POUR RESEAUX EVOLUES INTELLIGENTS | [1997/13] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.1997 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/13] | 02.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4310727 (LAWSER JOHN J) [A] 1-4,7-9,19-28* column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 56; figure 2 *; | [X] - THEUS ET AL., "Open access to the intelligent network: The road to more flexible and responsive services", TELEPHONY, US, (19940502), vol. 226, no. 18, pages 68 - 72 [X] 1,11,14 * the whole document * | [X] - CHEN, "Open AIN operations strategies", IEEE NETWORK OPERATIONS AND MANAGEMENT SYMPOSIUM, KISSIMMEE US, (19940214), vol. 1, pages 140 - 152, XP000452403 [X] 1,11 * page 145 - page 146 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/NOMS.1994.643249 | [A] - JOHNSON, "Provisioning AIN services", TELEPHONY, US, (19940530), vol. 226, no. 22, pages 24 - 25 [A] 1,8-11,14-18 * column W * | [A] - BOESE ET AL., "The multimedia SCP", GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, TOKYO JP, (19871115), vol. 1, pages 112 - 116 |