EP0770280 - ELECTRICAL INTERCONNECTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2000 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU State(s) deleted from list of lapses: MC | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RAYCHEM LIMITED Faraday Road Dorcan, Swindon, Wiltshire SN3 5HH / GB | [1997/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WINFIELD, Phillip, Roland Churchfield House Latton Swindon Wiltshire SN6 6DS / GB | 02 /
IONS, David 66 Gifford Road Stratton St Margaret Swindon Wiltshire SN3 4XR / GB | 03 /
REED, James, Patrick 229 Fulton Street Redwood City, CA 94062 / US | 04 /
KIERMAIER, Christian Auenstrasse 41 D-85521 Ottobrunn / DE | 05 /
CLARK, Brian 205 Santa Clara Street Brisbane, CA 94005 / US | [1997/18] | Representative(s) | Jones, David Colin, et al Raychem Limited Intellectual Property Law Department Faraday Road Dorcan Swindon, Wiltshire SN3 5HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/18] | Jones, David Colin, et al Raychem Limited Intellectual Property Law Department Faraday Road Dorcan Swindon, Wiltshire SN3 5HH / GB | Application number, filing date | 95924443.5 | 10.07.1995 | [1997/18] | WO1995GB01625 | Priority number, date | GB19940014037 | 11.07.1994 Original published format: GB 9414037 | [1997/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9602081 | Date: | 25.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0770280 | Date: | 02.05.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0770280 | Date: | 03.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H02G15/103, H02G15/184 | [1997/18] | CPC: |
H02G15/184 (EP);
H02G15/103 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/18] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE VERBINDUNGEN | [1997/18] | English: | ELECTRICAL INTERCONNECTIONS | [1997/18] | French: | INTERCONNEXIONS ELECTRIQUES | [1997/18] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.1997 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/18] | 02.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.08.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 10.07.1999 | [2004/39] |
Former [2003/17] | MC | 31.07.1999 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3571783 (LUSK GEORGE E) [A] 1-6,8 * column 2, line 27 - column 3, line 60; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US3845233 (BURTON E) [A] 1,2,4,14 * column 3, line 1 - line 40; figure 3 *; | [A]US3876820 (MASHIKIAN MATTHEW S) [A] 1-3,8,11,14 * column 1, line 14 - column 11, line 24; figures 1-10 *; | [A]US4377547 (HERVIG HAROLD C) [A] 1,2,10 * column 2, line 30 - column 4, line 7; figures 1-6 *; | [A]WO8602210 (PIRELLI CAVI SPA [IT]) [A] 1-3,10,14 * page 5, line 34 - page 6, line 18; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0321263 (ASS ELECT IND [GB]) [A] 1,2,4-6,14,15 * column 2, line 62 - column 4, line 41; figure 1 *; | [PAD]WO9511543 (RAYCHEM CORP [US]) [PAD] 1,2* page 6, line 7 - page 12, line 21; figures 1-3 * |