EP0724507 - MULTI-BLADE RAZOR HEAD WITH IMPROVED PERFORMANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY 201 Tabor Road Morris Plains New Jersey 07950 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/32] | For all designated states WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY 201 Tabor Road Morris Plains New Jersey 07950 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEXLER, Fred C. 89 Joshua Trail Madison, CT 06443 / US | [1996/32] | Representative(s) | MacGregor, Gordon, et al Eric Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/32] | MacGregor, Gordon, et al ERIC POTTER CLARKSON St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham, NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 95924658.8 | 22.06.1995 | [1996/32] | WO1995US07938 | Priority number, date | US19940294463 | 23.08.1994 Original published format: US 294463 | [1996/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9605948 | Date: | 29.02.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0724507 | Date: | 07.08.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.02.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0724507 | Date: | 08.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B26B21/22 | [1996/32] | CPC: |
B26B21/22 (EP,KR,US);
B26B21/222 (EP,US);
B26B21/4006 (EP,US);
B26B21/54 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT [1996/32] | Title | German: | DOPPELKLINGEN NASSRASIERER MIT ERHÖHTER LEISTUNG | [1996/32] | English: | MULTI-BLADE RAZOR HEAD WITH IMPROVED PERFORMANCE | [1996/32] | French: | TETE DE RASOIR A LAMES MULTIPLES ET A PERFORMANCES AMELIOREES | [1996/32] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.1996 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/32] | 05.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 15.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 02.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 08.09.1999 | GR | 08.09.1999 | IT | 08.09.1999 | [2008/06] |
Former [2004/07] | ES | 08.09.1999 | |
GR | 08.09.1999 | ||
Former [2002/26] | ES | 08.09.1999 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4094066 (DANIEL JR DONALD S) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]EP0348866 (GILLETTE CO [US]); | [A]US4912846 (YU YING MING [TW]); | [A]EP0559130 (WILKINSON SWORD GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-5,7,8,10-15 * column 2 - column 5; figure 5 * |