EP0786166 - A VOLTAGE CLAMPED PARALLEL RESONANT CONVERTER WITH CONTROLLABLE DUTY CYCLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.11.2000 [2000/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELECTRONIC POWER CONDITIONING, INC. Plaza Nine, Suite A, 1895 N.W. 9th Street Corvallis, OR 97330 / US | [1997/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAUW, Hian, K. 5986 NW Burgundy Drive Corvallis, OR 97330 / US | 02 /
ZEDWICK, Robert, S. 960 S.E. Mason Place Corvallis, OR 97333 / US | [1997/36] |
Former [1997/31] | 01 /
LAUW, Hian, K. 3446 N.W. Maxine Circle Corvallis, OR 97330 / US | ||
02 /
ZEDWICK, Robert, S. 960 S.E. Mason Place Corvallis, OR 97333 / US | Representative(s) | Meddle, Alan L. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/31] | Meddle, Alan Leonard FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95925635.5 | 11.07.1995 | [1997/31] | WO1995US08756 | Priority number, date | US19940322100 | 12.10.1994 Original published format: US 322100 | [1997/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9612339 | Date: | 25.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0786166 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.04.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/335, H02M5/458, H02M7/5387, H02M7/48 | [1998/02] | CPC: |
H02M7/4826 (EP,US);
Y02B70/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1997/31] | H02M3/335, H02M5/458, H02M7/5387 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1997/31] | Title | German: | SPANNUNGSBEGRENZTER PARALLELRESONANZWANDLER MIT STEUERBAREM TASTVERHÄLTNI | [1997/31] | English: | A VOLTAGE CLAMPED PARALLEL RESONANT CONVERTER WITH CONTROLLABLE DUTY CYCLE | [1997/31] | French: | CONVERTISSEUR RESONANT PARALLELE A TENSION IMPOSEE ET A FACTEUR DE MARCHE AJUSTABLE | [1997/31] | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.1997 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.1997 | Search fee paid | 04.04.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 04.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/31] | 13.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/46] | 21.06.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2000 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5111374 (LAI JIH-SHENG [US], et al) [X] 1-3,13-18 * column 6, line 35 - column 7, line 57; figures 7,8; claims 1,2 *; | [X]WO9409559 (ELECTRONIC POWER CONDITIONING [US]) [X] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [DA] - DIVAN D M ET AL, "A SYNCHRONIZED RESONANT DC LINK CONVERTER FOR SOFT-SWITCHED PWM", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS, (19930901), vol. 29, no. 5, pages 940 - 947, XP000423221 [DA] 1,13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/28.245718 | International search | [Y]US4864483 (DIVAN DEEPAKRAJ M [US]); | [Y]US5038267 (DE DONCKER RIK W A A [US], et al); | [Y]US5172309 (DEDONCKER RIK W A A [US], et al); | [Y]US5267133 (MOTOMURA HIROYUKI [JP], et al) |