EP0776496 - CIRCUIT FOR THE DRIVE OF AT LEAST ONE ELECTRICALLY ACTUATED MAGNET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.09.1999 [1999/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Hochstrasse 17 81669 München / DE | [1998/29] |
Former [1997/23] | For all designated states BOSCH-SIEMENS HAUSGERÄTE GmbH Hochstrasse 17 81669 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STRAUSS, Georg Steigstrasse 107/4 D-89537 Giengen / DE | [1997/23] | Application number, filing date | 95925839.3 | 06.07.1995 | [1997/23] | WO1995EP02620 | Priority number, date | DE19944429918 | 23.08.1994 Original published format: DE 4429918 | [1997/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9606388 | Date: | 29.02.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0776496 | Date: | 04.06.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.02.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0776496 | Date: | 30.09.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G05D23/19 | [1997/23] | CPC: |
F25D11/022 (EP);
H01F7/18 (EP);
F25D2400/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1997/23] | Title | German: | SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG ZUR ANSTEUERUNG WENIGSTENS EINES ELEKTRISCH ANSTEUERBAREN MAGNETEN | [1997/23] | English: | CIRCUIT FOR THE DRIVE OF AT LEAST ONE ELECTRICALLY ACTUATED MAGNET | [1997/23] | French: | CIRCUIT D'EXCITATION D'AU MOINS UN AIMANT A EXCITATION ELECTRIQUE | [1998/40] |
Former [1997/23] | CIRCUITERIE D'EXCITATION D'AU MOINS UN AIMANT A EXCITATION ELECTRIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.1997 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/23] | 11.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]FR2600150 (ELBI INT SPA [IT]) [Y] 1,5 * page 2, line 20 - page 9, line 6; figures 1,2 * [A] 2; | [Y]JPS62288783 ; | [A]US4838037 (WOOD TONY J [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 10 - column 3, line 19; figures 1,2 *; | [A]JPS61244983 ; | [A]EP0069931 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [DE]) [A] * the whole document * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19871215), vol. 12, no. 179, Database accession no. (M - 701), & JP62288783 A 19871215 (MITSUBISHI) [Y] 1,5 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861031), vol. 11, no. 94, Database accession no. (M - 574), & JP61244983 A 19861031 (NISSAN) [A] 1 * abstract * |