EP0724825 - PLANT GROWING SHEET STRUCTURE, NATURAL LAWN GRASS SHEET STRUCTURE, LAWN GRASS GROWING METHOD AND METHOD FOR LAYING LAWN GRASS SHEET STRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Otsuka Kagaku Kabushiki Kaisha 2-27, Otedori 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540 / JP | For all designated states MAEDAKENSETSUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 10-26, Fujimi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/32] | For all designated states OTSUKA KAGAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-27, Otedori 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540 / JP | ||
For all designated states MAEDAKENSETSUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 10-26, Fujimi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIKAWA, Yoshio 249-13, Higashiojicho Kishiwada-shi, Osaka 596 / JP | 02 /
FUKUMOTO, Hiroaki 1-22-16, Takatsukadai Kawai-cho Kitakatsuragi-gun, Nara 636 / JP | 03 /
HIRASAWA, Toshimasa, Maedakensetsukogyo K.K. 10-26, Fujimi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102 / JP | 04 /
HATADO, Tatsuo, Maedakensetsukogyo K.K. 10-26, Fujimi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102 / JP | 05 /
TAGA, Akira, Maedakensetsukogyo K.K. 10-26, Fujimi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102 / JP | 06 /
YAMADA, Kaoru, Maedakensetsukogyo K.K. 10-26, Fujimi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102 / JP | [1996/32] | Representative(s) | Barz, Peter Meissner Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Barz, Peter Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2 80803 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/32] | Barz, Peter, Dr. Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2 80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95926005.0 | 21.07.1995 | [1996/32] | WO1995JP01451 | Priority number, date | JP19940192021 | 23.07.1994 Original published format: JP 19202194 | JP19940300896 | 05.12.1994 Original published format: JP 30089694 | JP19940300897 | 05.12.1994 Original published format: JP 30089794 | [1996/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9603027 | Date: | 08.02.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0724825 | Date: | 07.08.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0724825 | Date: | 13.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.02.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A01G1/12, A01G13/00 | [1996/32] | CPC: |
E01C13/083 (EP,US);
A01G20/20 (EP,US);
A01C1/044 (EP);
E01C2013/006 (EP,US);
E01C2013/086 (EP,US);
Y10T428/23957 (EP,US);
Y10T428/23979 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/32] | Title | German: | SCHICHTSTRUKTUR FÜR DIE PFLANZENZUCHT, SCHICHTSTRUKTUR FÜR NATÜRLICHEN RASEN, VERFAHREN ZUM ZÜCHTEN VON RASENGRAS UND VERFAHREN ZUM LEGEN VON RASENSCHICHTSTRUKTUREN | [1996/32] | English: | PLANT GROWING SHEET STRUCTURE, NATURAL LAWN GRASS SHEET STRUCTURE, LAWN GRASS GROWING METHOD AND METHOD FOR LAYING LAWN GRASS SHEET STRUCTURES | [1996/32] | French: | STRUCTURE EN FEUILLE POUR LA CROISSANCE DES PLANTES, STRUCTURE EN FEUILLE POUR LA CROISSANCE DU GAZON NATUREL, PROCEDE POUR FAIRE POUSSER DU GAZON ET PROCEDE POUR POSER DES STRUCTURES EN FEUILLE PORTANT DU GAZON | [1996/32] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.1996 | Translation filed | 22.03.1996 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.1996 | Search fee paid | 22.03.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/32] | 11.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO8503842 (BEHRENS WOLFGANG [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,12,19,24 * page 10, paragraph 2 - page 11, paragraph L; figure - *[A] 2,7-11,14,21 | International search | [Y]JPH03262405 (DYNIC CORP); | [X]JPH049553U |