EP0769931 - AN ASSEMBLY AND METHOD FOR PREVENTION OF URINARY INCONTINENCE IN HUMANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.05.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.07.2000 [2000/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UROMED CORPORATION 64 A Street Needham, MA 02194 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/18] | For all designated states UROMED CORPORATION 64 A Street Needham, MA 02194 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIMON, John, G. 150 Appleton Street, 1C Boston, MA 02116 / US | 02 /
MAXFIELD-BAHR, Michelle 1006 Broadway Somerville, MA 02144 / US | 03 /
MCLAUGHLIN, Paul, D. 30 Wilshire Drive Scituate, MA 02066 / US | 04 /
FELICE, Leo, C. 75 Eagle Peak Road Pascoage, RI 02859 / US | 05 /
JOSHI, Sharad 165 Waverley Avenue Watertown, MA 02172 / US | [1997/18] | Representative(s) | Torggler, Paul, et al Patentanwälte Torggler und Hofinger Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 Postfach 556 6021 Innsbruck / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1997/18] | Torggler, Paul, Dr., et al Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 6020 Innsbruck / AT | Application number, filing date | 95926127.2 | 29.06.1995 | [1997/18] | WO1995US08157 | Priority number, date | US19940267487 | 29.06.1994 Original published format: US 267487 | US19940274995 | 13.07.1994 Original published format: US 274995 | [1997/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9600542 | Date: | 11.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0769931 | Date: | 02.05.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.01.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/48 | [1997/18] | CPC: |
A61F2/0009 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/18] | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERHINDERUNG VON HARNINKONTINENZ BEI MENSCHEN | [1997/18] | English: | AN ASSEMBLY AND METHOD FOR PREVENTION OF URINARY INCONTINENCE IN HUMANS | [1997/18] | French: | ENSEMBLE ET PROCEDE DE PREVENTION DE L'INCONTINENCE URINAIRE CHEZ L'HOMME | [1997/18] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.1997 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.1997 | Search fee paid | 29.01.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/18] | 31.12.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/28] | 07.02.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2000/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1999 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0193406 (MEDTRONIC INC) [X] 1,5,6,12,13,16-18,21 * column 2, line 19 - column 3, line 7 * * column 3, line 54 - column 6, line 11 * * figure -; claim - *; | [X]WO9219192 (COLOPLAST AS) [X] 1,4,10,11,17-26,30,31 * page 4, line 5 - page 9, line 34 * * figure -; claim - *; | [A]WO9211826 (UROMED CORP) [A] 3,7-9,14,15,27-29; | [A]DE867126 (DR. SALM H) [A] 1,4-6,10-13,16-26,30,31 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US5158535 ; | [Y]US702570 ; | [Y]AU75036B ; | [Y]US4286596 ; | [Y]US4361150 ; | [X]US3841304 ; | [Y]US4261340 |