EP0769898 - ENDO-1,4-beta -GLUCANASE GENES AND THEIR USE IN PLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2001 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.12.2001 [2001/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 300 Lakeside Drive 22nd Floor Oakland, California 94612-3550 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/18] | For all designated states THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA 300 Lakeside Drive, 22nd Floor Oakland, California 94612-3550 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENNETT, Alan B. 3212 Chesapeake Bay Davis, CA 95616 / US | 02 /
FISCHER, Robert L. 1423 Scott Street El Cerrito, CA 94530 / US | 03 /
LASHBROOK, Coralie 7975 Doyle Lane Dixon, CA 95620 / US | 04 /
GIOVANNONI, James 3 Elmcrest Circle Ithaca, NY 14850 / US | [1997/18] | Representative(s) | Harrison, David Christopher, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/18] | Harrison, David Christopher, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 95926221.3 | 07.07.1995 | [1997/18] | WO1995US08602 | Priority number, date | US19940271883 | 07.07.1994 Original published format: US 271883 | [1997/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9601555 | Date: | 25.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0769898 | Date: | 02.05.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.01.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/56, C12N15/82, C12N9/24, A01H5/00 | [1998/19] | CPC: |
C12N15/8249 (EP,US);
C12N9/2437 (EP,US);
C12N9/244 (EP,US);
C12Y302/01004 (EP,US);
C12Y302/01006 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/18] | A01H1/02, A01H5/00, C12N9/42, C12N15/29, C12N15/56, C12N15/64, C12N15/82, C12N15/84 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/18] | Title | German: | ENDO-1,4-beta -GLUCANASEGENE UND IHRE VERWENDUNGEN IN PFLANZEN | [1997/19] | English: | ENDO-1,4-beta -GLUCANASE GENES AND THEIR USE IN PLANTS | [1997/18] | French: | GENES D'ENDO-1,4-beta -GLUCANASE ET UTILISATION DE CES DERNIERS DANS DES PLANTES | [1997/18] |
Former [1997/18] | ENDO-1,4-$g(b)-GLUCANASEGENE UND IHRE VERWENDUNGEN IN PFLANZEN | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.1997 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.1997 | Search fee paid | 30.01.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 30.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/18] | 24.10.2001 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2001/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2001 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9116426 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [X] 1-17,19 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9116440 (ICI PLC [GB]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [OX] - GONZALEZ-BOSCH, C., ET AL., "Sequence analysis and immunological detection of two divergent tomato endo-beta-1,4-glucanases", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY SUPPLEMENT, (199305), vol. 102, page 99, XP002058666 [OX] 18 * abstract 556 * | [PX] - LASHBROOK, C.C., ET AL., "Lycopersicon esculentum endo-1,4-beta-glucanase precursor (Cel2) mRNA, complete cds", EMBL DATABASE ACCESSION NO. U13055, 17-DEC-1994, XP002058667 [PX] 15,18 * the whole document * | [X] - LASHBROOK, C.C., ET AL., "Functional analysis of Cx-cellulase (endo-beta-1,4-glucanase) gene expression in transgenic tomato fruit", CURR. PLANT SCI. BIOTECHNOL. AGRIC., (1993), vol. 16, pages 123 - 128, XP002058668 [X] 1-14 * the whole document * | [A] - BRUMMEL, D.A., ET AL., "Plant endo-1,4-beta-d-glucanases. Structure, properties, and physiological function.", ACS SYMP SER, (1994), vol. 566, pages 100 - 129, XP002058669 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * | [A] - CATALA, C., ET AL., "A novel plant endo-beta1,4-glucanase is expressed primarily in vegetative tissues", SUPPLEMENT TO PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, (199405), vol. 105, no. 1, page 71, XP002058670 [A] * abstract 351 * | International search | [Y]US4801540 (HIATT WILLIAM R [US], et al) | [Y] - PLANT MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, Volume 3, issued 1984, CHRISTOFFERSEN et al., "Cellulase Gene Expression in Ripening Avocado Fruit: The Accumulation of Cellulase mRNA and Protein as Demonstrated by cDNA Hybridization and Immunodetection", pages 385-391. | [Y] - THE EMBO JOURNAL, Volume 7, Number 11, issued November 1988, DEIKMAN et al., "Interaction of a DNA Binding Factor With the 5'-Flanking Region of an Ethylene-Responsive Fruit Ripening Gene from Tomato", pages 3315-3320. |