EP0773785 - TREATMENT OF CANCER USING HSV MUTANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 24.07.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2009 | New entry: Despatch of communication that opposition is rejected | 24.07.2009 | Opposition rejected | published on 26.08.2009 [2009/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Crusade Laboratories Limited P.O. Box 1716 Glasgow G51 4WF / GB | For all designated states THE WISTAR INSTITUTE OF ANATOMY AND BIOLOGY 3601 Spruce Street Philadelpia, PA 19104-4268 / US | [2006/04] |
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY COURT OF THE UNIVERSITY OF GLASGOW No. 2 The Square, University Avenue Glasgow G12 8QQ / GB | ||
For all designated states THE WISTAR INSTITUTE OF ANATOMY AND BIOLOGY 3601 Spruce Street Philadelpia, PA 19104-4268 / US | |||
Former [1997/21] | For all designated states MEDICAL RESEARCH COUNCIL 20 Park Crescent London W1N 4AL / GB | ||
For all designated states THE WISTAR INSTITUTE OF ANATOMY AND BIOLOGY 3601 Spruce Street Philadelpia, PA 19104-4268 / US | |||
For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY COURT OF THE UNIVERSITY OF GLASGOW No. 2 The Square, University Avenue Glasgow G12 8QQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MACLEAN, Alasdair, Roderick 36 Colwood Place Glasgow G53 7YB / GB | 02 /
BROWN, Susanne, Moira 5 Bellshaugh Road Glasgow G12 0SN / GB | 03 /
FRASER, Nigel, William 511 South 46th Street Philadelphia, PA 19143 / US | 04 /
RANDAZZO, Bruce, Paul 2409 Manning Street Philadelphia, PA 19103 / US | [1997/21] | Representative(s) | Cripps, Joanna Elizabeth, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/38] | Cripps, Joanna Elizabeth, et al Mewburn Ellis York House 23 Kingsway GB-London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [1997/21] | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 95927034.9 | 28.07.1995 | [1997/21] | WO1995GB01791 | Priority number, date | GB19940015320 | 29.07.1994 Original published format: GB 9415320 | [1997/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9603997 | Date: | 15.02.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0773785 | Date: | 21.05.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0773785 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/76, C12N15/38, A61P35/00 | [2001/27] | CPC: |
C12N7/00 (EP,US);
A61K35/763 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1997/21] | A61K35/76, C12N15/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/21] | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS DURCH VERWENDUNG VON HSV-MUTANTEN | [1997/21] | English: | TREATMENT OF CANCER USING HSV MUTANT | [1997/21] | French: | TRAITEMENT DU CANCER A L'AIDE D'UN MUTANT DU VIRUS DE L'HERPES (HSV) | [1997/21] | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.1997 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/21] | 02.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 22.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 22.12.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 19.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP01126852.1 / EP1192948 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
26.03.2003
03.04.2003
ADMISSIBLE MediGene Aktiengesellschaft Lochhamer Strasse 11 82152 Planegg/Martinsried / DE Opponent's representative Bösl, Raphael Konrad, et al, et al Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstraße 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.03.2003
03.04.2003
ADMISSIBLE MediGene Aktiengesellschaft Lochhamer Strasse 11 82152 Planegg/Martinsried / DE Opponent's representative Bösl, Raphael Konrad, et al, et al Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn Prinzregentenstrasse 68 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/21] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.03.2003
03.04.2003
ADMISSIBLE MediGene Aktiengesellschaft Lochhamer Strasse 11 82152 Planegg/Martinsried / DE Opponent's representative Bösl, Raphael, Dr. rer. nat., Dipl.-Chem., et al, et al Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn Postfach 860 880 81635 München / DE | 30.04.2003 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.09.2003 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 04.08.2005 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 31.01.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.02.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.03.2006 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.03.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 04.03.2009 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2009/35] | 04.03.2009 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Appeal following opposition | 31.05.2006 | Appeal received No. T0801/06 | 28.07.2006 | Statement of grounds filed | 04.03.2009 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in unamended form | 29.05.2006 | Appeal received | 04.03.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.03.2009 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Request for further processing for: | 19.01.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 24.01.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.03.2000 | Decision despatched | 22.09.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 22.09.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 07.10.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO9213943 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM BIOLOG [BE]) [AD] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [XD] - MARKERT, J.M. ET AL., "Reduction and elimination of encephalitis in an experimental glioma therapy model with attenuated herpes simplex mutants that retain susceptibility to acyclovir", NEUROSURGERY, vol. 32, pages 597 - 603, XP002090036 [XD] 1-16 * the whole document * | [AD] - CHOU, J. ET AL., "MAPPING OF HERPES SIMPLEX VIRUS-1 NEUROVIRULENCE TO GAMMA-1 34.5, A GENE NONESSENTIAL FOR GROWTH IN CULTURE", SCIENCE, vol. 250, pages 1262 - 1266, XP002018560 [AD] 1-16 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.2173860 | [A] - TAHA, M.Y. ET AL., "A VARIANT OF HERPES SIMPLEX VIRUS TYPE 2 STRAIN HG52 WITH A 1.5 KB DELETION IN TL BETWEEN 0 TO 0.02 AND 0.81 TO 0.83 MAP UNITS IS NON-NEUROVIRULENT FOR MICE", JOURNAL OF GENERAL VIROLOGY, vol. 70, pages 705 - 716, XP000560886 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | [PX] - BOVIATSIS, E.J. ET AL., "ANTITUMOR ACTIVITY AND REPORTER GENE TRANSFER INTO RAT BRAIN NEOPLASMS INOCULATED WITH HERPES SIMPLEX VIRUS VECTORS DEFECTIVE IN THYMIDINE KINASE OR RIBOUCLEOTIDE REDUCTASE", GENE THERAPY, vol. 1, pages 323 - 331, XP000867507 [PX] 1-16 * the whole document * | Examination | WO9600007 |