EP0773803 - COMPOSITE POLYESTER MATERIAL HAVING A LUBRICOUS SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.10.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADVANCED CARDIOVASCULAR SYSTEMS, INC. 3200 Lakeside Drive, P.O. Box 58167 Santa Clara California 95052-8167 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/21] | For all designated states ADVANCED CARDIOVASCULAR SYSTEMS, INC. 3200 Lakeside Drive, P.O. Box 58167 Santa Clara California 95052-8167 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHENG, Tai, C. 3375 Kenzo Court Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | 02 /
HARRINGTON, Douglas, C. 2813 La Jolla Avenue San Jose, CA 95124 / US | 03 /
AINSWORTH, Robert, D. 400 Twin Pines Drive Scotts Valley, CA 95066 / US | [1997/21] | Representative(s) | Barz, Peter Meissner Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Barz, Peter Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2 80803 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/21] | Barz, Peter, Dr. Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2 80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95927163.6 | 17.07.1995 | [1997/21] | WO1995US08836 | Priority number, date | US19940280291 | 25.07.1994 Original published format: US 280291 | [1997/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9603163 | Date: | 08.02.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0773803 | Date: | 21.05.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61L29/00 | [1997/21] | CPC: |
A61L29/14 (EP);
A61L29/126 (EP);
A61M25/0045 (EP);
A61M25/104 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1997/21] | Title | German: | POLYESTERVERBUNDMATERIAL MIT REIBUNGSARMER OBERFLAECHE | [1997/21] | English: | COMPOSITE POLYESTER MATERIAL HAVING A LUBRICOUS SURFACE | [1997/21] | French: | MATERIAU POLYESTER COMPOSITE DOTE D'UNE SURFACE GLISSANTE | [1997/21] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.1997 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 24.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/21] | 20.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/47] | 29.06.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1998 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.09.1998 | 31.07.2000 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]WO9315781 (ADVANCED CARDIOVASCULAR SYSTEM) [DX] 1-40 * figure 1; claim - *; | [X]EP0124955 (BEATRICE FOODS CO) [X] 1-25 * page 5, line 20 - line 26; example -; claim - *; | [A]US5073365 (KATZ MARTIN ET AL) [A] 1-40 * claim - *; | [A]WO9400176 (ADVANCED CARDIOVASCULAR SYSTEM) [A] 1-40 * figure 1; claim - * |