EP0778867 - LIQUID CRYSTALLINE POLYMER COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2000 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/25] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAGGONER, Marion, Glen 36 Sageway Road Hockessin, DE 19707-9803 / US | [1997/25] | Representative(s) | Jones, Alan John CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/25] | Jones, Alan John CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 95927213.9 | 21.07.1995 | [1997/25] | WO1995US08969 | Priority number, date | US19940298992 | 31.08.1994 Original published format: US 298992 | [1997/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9606888 | Date: | 07.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0778867 | Date: | 18.06.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0778867 | Date: | 15.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C08L67/00, C08L67/04, C08L77/12, C08L79/08 | [1997/25] | CPC: |
C08L67/00 (EP);
C08L67/04 (EP);
C08L77/12 (EP);
C08L79/08 (EP);
C08L23/06 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L67/00, C08L2666/06 (EP);
C08L67/04, C08L2666/06 (EP);
C08L77/12, C08L23/00 (EP);
C08L79/08, C08L23/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1997/25] | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKRISTALLINE HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [1997/25] | English: | LIQUID CRYSTALLINE POLYMER COMPOSITION | [1997/25] | French: | COMPOSITION A BASE DE POLYMERE CRISTALLIN LIQUIDE | [1997/25] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.1997 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/25] | 01.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 15.09.1999 | SE | 15.09.1999 | [2003/09] |
Former [2002/23] | SE | 15.09.1999 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0462844 (TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC) [X] 1,2,5-16 * page 6, line 40 - line 46; claims 1-3,13-16 *; | [X]US3647920 (R. R. DI LEONE) [X] 1-4,13-15 * column 2, line 29 - line 53; claims 1-10 *; | [X]JPH01292057 ; | [A]EP0111179 (GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY) [A] 1-16 * claims 1-16,20-25 * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 90, no. 02, Database accession no. 90-011669, & JPH01292057 A 19891124 (UENO PHARMACEUTICAL) [X] 1,2,5-16 * abstract * | [A] - IVANOV, V. E. ET AL, "Structurization of lubricants by liquid crystalline compounds", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19930906), vol. 119, no. 10, Database accession no. 99421 [A] 1-16 * abstract * | [ ] - KHIM. TEHKNOL. TOPL. MASEL, vol. 2, pages 17 - 18 | Examination | JPH01292057 |