EP0775115 - DIMERIC ARYLISOQUINOLINE ALKALOIDS AND SYNTHESIS METHODS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.01.2004 [2004/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, as represented by THE SECRETARY, Department of Health and Human Services National Institutes of Health, Office of Technology Transfer, Box OTT Bethesda, MD 20892-9902 / US | For all designated states THE TRUSTEES OF BOSTON COLLEGE 140 Commonwealth Avenue Chestnut Hill, MA 02167 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/04] | For all designated states THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, as represented by THE SECRETARY, Department of Health and Human Services National Institutes of Health, Office of Technology Transfer, Box OTT Bethesda, MD 20892-9902 / US | ||
For all designated states THE TRUSTEES OF BOSTON COLLEGE 140 Commonwealth Avenue Chestnut Hill, MA 02167 / US | |||
Former [1997/22] | For all designated states THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, as represented by the Secretary of the Department of Health and Human Services National Institutes of Health, Office of Technology Transfer, Box OTT Bethesda, MD 20892-9902 / US | ||
For all designated states THE TRUSTEES OF BOSTON COLLEGE 140 Commonwealth Avenue Chestnut Hill, MA 02167 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRINGMANN, Gerhard Gertrud-von-le-Fort-Strasse 41 D-97074 Wurzburg / DE | 02 /
BOYD, Michael, R. 5217 Fairgreene Way Ijamsville, MD 21754 / US | 03 /
GOTZ, Roland Schumannstrasse 4 D-91541 Rothenburg / DE | 04 /
KELLY, T., Ross 14 Everett Avenue Watertown, MA 02172 / US | [1997/22] | Representative(s) | Walton, Seán Malcolm, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/22] | Walton, Seán Malcolm, et al Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 95927269.1 | 19.07.1995 | [1997/22] | WO1995US09070 | Priority number, date | US19940279339 | 22.07.1994 Original published format: US 279339 | US19940279291 | 22.07.1994 Original published format: US 279291 | US19940305211 | 13.09.1994 Original published format: US 305211 | US19940363684 | 23.12.1994 Original published format: US 363684 | [1997/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9603381 | Date: | 08.02.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0775115 | Date: | 28.05.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0775115 | Date: | 22.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07D217/02, C07D217/04 | [1997/22] | CPC: |
C07D217/02 (EP,US);
A61P31/12 (EP);
C07D217/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/22] | Title | German: | DIMERE ARYLISOQHINOLINE ALKALOIDE UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [1997/22] | English: | DIMERIC ARYLISOQUINOLINE ALKALOIDS AND SYNTHESIS METHODS THEREOF | [1997/22] | French: | ALCALOIDES DU TYPE ARYLISOQUINOLEINES DIMERES ET PROCEDES POUR LES SYNTHETISER | [1997/22] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.1997 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/22] | 18.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO9218125 (US HEALTH [US]) [X] 19,20 * claims 1,2 * * claim - *[A] 1-18 | [XD] - KIRK P.MANFREDI ET AL, "Novel alkaloids from the tropical plant Ancistrocladus abbreviatus inhibit cell killing by HIV-1 and HIV-2", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, WASHINGTON US, vol. 34, no. 12, pages 3402 - 3405 [XD] 19,20 * see page 3402 compounds 1 and 2 * | [PDX] - GERHARD BRINGMANN, "Biomimetic oxidative dimerization of Korupensamine A:Completion of the first total synthesis of Michellamines A,B,and C", TETRAHEDRON,, OXFORD GB, (19940808), vol. 50, no. 32, pages 9643 - 9648 [PDX] 1-20 * the whole document * | [PX] - THOMAS R. HOYE ET AL, "Total synthesis of Michellamines A-C:Important anti-HIV agents", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, OXFORD GB, (19941121), vol. 35, no. 47, pages 8747 - 8750 [PX] 1-20 * the whole document * | [PX] - T.ROSS KELLY ET AL, "Convergent total synthesis of the Michellamines", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, OXFORD GB, (19941010), vol. 35, no. 41, pages 7621 - 7624 [PX] 1-20 * the whole document * |