EP0771286 - APPARATUS AND CONTINUOUS PROCESS FOR MAKING COAGULATION ASSAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2002 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roche Diagnostics Corporation 9115 Hague Road Indianapolis, IN 46250 / US | [1999/32] |
Former [1997/19] | For all designated states BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM CORPORATION P.O. Box 50 100 , 9115 Hague Road Indianapolis Indiana 46250 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRAGE, Henry, M., Jr. 1329 Helford Lane Carmel, IN 46032 / US | 02 /
BROWN, Stanley, G., Jr. 137 Berkeley Road Indianapolis, IN 46208 / US | 03 /
ALDERINK, Michael, W. 315 W. Main St. Box 271 Westfield, IN 46074 / US | 04 /
VAN BUREN, Elon, Thomas 10744 Seaview Lane East Carmel, IN 46032 / US | 05 /
LYNCH, Waring, Charles 6604 Moss Circle Indianapolis, IN 46237 / US | [1997/19] | Representative(s) | Jung, Michael, et al Roche Diagnostics GmbH Patentabteilung Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [2009/52] |
Former [1997/19] | Jung, Michael, Dr., et al Boehringer Mannheim GmbH, Patentabteilung 68298 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 95927313.7 | 20.07.1995 | [1997/19] | WO1995US09170 | Priority number, date | US19940278424 | 21.07.1994 Original published format: US 278424 | [1997/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9603318 | Date: | 08.02.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0771286 | Date: | 07.05.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0771286 | Date: | 14.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.02.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B65B3/04, B65B9/04, B65B29/00 | [1997/19] | CPC: |
B01L3/505 (EP,US);
G01N33/4905 (EP,US);
G01N2035/0436 (EP,US);
G01N35/00009 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/19] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND KONTINUIERLICHES VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER GERINNUNGSTESTEINRICHTUNG | [1997/19] | English: | APPARATUS AND CONTINUOUS PROCESS FOR MAKING COAGULATION ASSAY DEVICE | [1997/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE CONTINU DE FABRICATION D'UNE BANDE SERVANT A REALISER DES TECHNIQUES DE COAGULATION | [1997/19] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.1997 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.1997 | Search fee paid | 20.02.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 20.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/19] | 20.06.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.09.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0296388 (ENVIRO SPRAY SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 9 * column 1, line 4 - column 1, line 13 * * column 5, line 15 - column 5, line 49 * * column 8, line 20 - column 11, line 8 * * column 12, line 20 - column 13, line 20 * * column 13, line 55 - column 14, line 5 * * column 14, line 44 - column 15, line 14 * * figures 2,4,5,12 * [A] 7,1-3,6,8; | [A]US4983416 (HUNSINGER PETER [US], et al) [A] 1-3,8,9 * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 16 * * column 3, line 45 - column 6, line 2 * * figures 1,3,5,7 *; | [XA]EP0483117 (BIOTRACK INC [US]) [X] 9,11 * page 2, line 9 - page 2, line 10 * * page 3, line 49 - page 4, line 8 * * page 5, line 4 - page 5, line 29 * * page 5, line 53 - page 6, line 25 * * page 7, line 37 - page 7, line 49 * * page 10, line 51 - page 12, line 26 * * page 12, line 55 - page 13, line 12 * * page 13, line 26 - page 14, line 13; figures 1-8 * [A] 6,1-4,7,4; | [PA]EP0646367 (SCHERER LTD R P [GB]) [PA] 1,3,9 * column 1, line 1 - column 1, line 27 * * column 2, line 3 - column 2, line 31 * * column 2, line 49 - column 4, line 18 ** figures 1-5 * | International search | [A]US2513852 (DONOFRIO ALFONSO M); | [A]US4437294 (ROMAGNOLI ANDREA [IT]); | [A]US4849380 (SAWHILL HOWARD T [US]); | [A]US4921021 (ANDERSSON SVEN A [SE]); | [A]US5016425 (WEICK HEINZ H [CH]); | [A]US5110727 (OBERHARDT BRUCE J [US]); | [A]US5315810 (EATON JAY S [US]) |