EP0775166 - POLYURETHANE POWDER COATINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.1999 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PPG Industries Ohio, Inc. 3800 West 143rd Street Cleveland, OH 44111 / US | [1999/27] |
Former [1997/22] | For all designated states PPG INDUSTRIES, INC. One PPG Place Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15272 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARBEE, Robert, Boyd 500 Rambling Road Kingsport, TN 37664-2131 / US | 02 /
PHILLIPS, Brian, Steven P.O. Box 7221 Kingsport, TN 37664 / US | [1997/42] |
Former [1997/22] | 01 /
BARBEE, Robert, Boyd 201 Mahlon Drive Kingsport, TN 37663 / US | ||
02 /
PHILLIPS, Brian, Steven P.O. Box 7221 Kingsport, TN 37664 / US | Representative(s) | Fleischer, Holm Herbert, et al polypatent Postfach 40 02 43 51410 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/22] | Fleischer, Holm Herbert, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. H.-G. Sternagel, Dr. H. Fleischer, Dr. H. Dörries, Sander Aue 30 51465 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 95927456.4 | 27.07.1995 | [1997/22] | WO1995US09429 | Priority number, date | US19940291077 | 08.08.1994 Original published format: US 291077 | [1997/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9605239 | Date: | 22.02.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0775166 | Date: | 28.05.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0775166 | Date: | 09.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/42, C08G18/46 | [1997/22] | CPC: |
C08G18/8074 (EP,US);
C08G18/4202 (EP,US);
C08G18/4661 (EP,US);
C08G18/798 (EP,US);
C08G18/8067 (EP,US);
C09D167/02 (EP,US);
C08G2150/20 (EP,US);
Y10S525/934 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31551 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31605 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C09D167/02, C08L67/02, C08L2666/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/22] | Title | German: | POLYURETHANPULVERBESCHICHTUNGEN | [1997/22] | English: | POLYURETHANE POWDER COATINGS | [1997/22] | French: | POUDRES DE REVETEMENT DE POLYURETHANE | [1997/22] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.1997 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/22] | 31.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 09.09.1998 | GR | 09.09.1998 | LI | 09.09.1998 | DK | 09.12.1998 | SE | 09.12.1998 | PT | 14.12.1998 | [2003/45] |
Former [2001/23] | CH | 09.09.1998 | |
GR | 09.09.1998 | ||
LI | 09.09.1998 | ||
SE | 09.12.1998 | ||
PT | 14.12.1998 | ||
Former [2000/52] | CH | 09.09.1998 | |
LI | 09.09.1998 | ||
SE | 09.12.1998 | ||
PT | 14.12.1998 | ||
Former [2000/50] | SE | 09.12.1998 | |
CH | 14.12.1998 | ||
LI | 14.12.1998 | ||
PT | 14.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/32] | SE | 09.12.1998 | |
PT | 14.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/29] | PT | 14.12.1998 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2124567 (VEBA CHEMIE AG); | [D]US4212962 (DISTELDORF JOSEF [DE], et al); | [A]US4966932 (MCGREGOR CHARLES W [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 38 - column 3, line 55; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0504454 (NIPPON ESTER CO LTD [JP]); | [A]WO9304102 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 1 * page 6, line 30 - page 11, line 24; claims 1-3 *; | [D]US5229470 (NOZAKI TOKUZO [JP], et al); | [A]EP0553750 (NIPPON ESTER CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 8 - page 4, line 58; claims 1-6 * |