EP0777879 - EQUIVALENT CIRCUIT FOR SEVERAL FUNCTIONAL UNITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2000 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.07.2000 [2000/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/24] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHALAMON, Friedrich Albert-Schweitzer-Strasse 18 D-82110 Germering / DE | 02 /
IKI, Kunihiko Balduin-Helm-Strasse 17 D-82256 Fürstenfeldbruck / DE | [1997/24] | Application number, filing date | 95927631.2 | 04.08.1995 | [1997/24] | WO1995DE01024 | Priority number, date | DE19944431021 | 31.08.1994 Original published format: DE 4431021 | [1997/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9607138 | Date: | 07.03.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0777879 | Date: | 11.06.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0777879 | Date: | 21.07.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/20, H04L1/22 | [1997/24] | CPC: |
H03K17/76 (EP,US);
G06F11/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/24] | Title | German: | ERSATZSCHALTUNG FÜR MEHRERE FUNKTIONSEINHEITEN | [1997/24] | English: | EQUIVALENT CIRCUIT FOR SEVERAL FUNCTIONAL UNITS | [1997/24] | French: | CIRCUIT EQUIVALENT POUR PLUSIEURS UNITES FONCTIONNELLES | [1997/24] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.1997 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.02.1997 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/24] | 19.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS5911454 ; | [A]US3937936 (SAPORITO JAMES, et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]US4082964 (GIES JOHANNES) [DA] 7 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0496999 (ROHDE & SCHWARZ [DE]) [DA] 10 * column 2, line 17 - column 3, line 52; figure 1 *; | [A]DE4132598 (ANT NACHRICHTENTECH [DE]); | [A]EP0507379 (ALCATEL NV [NL], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840512), vol. 8, no. 101, Database accession no. (P - 273), & JP59011454 A 19840121 (MITSUBISHI DENKI) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - BRADY ET AL, "automatic duplexing for data processors", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, (197511), vol. 18, no. 6, pages 1691 - 1692 [A] 1-3 * the whole document * |