EP0775773 - ADHESIVE PADDING CLOTH, METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME AND BONDING AGENT FOR ADHESIVE CLOTHS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.10.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha 2-6, Dojimahama 1-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8205 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/22] | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 2-6, Dojimahama 1-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIZUNO, Masayoshi 43-1, Kamo Mishima-shi Shizuoka 411 / JP | 02 /
ISOSHIMA, Kazumi 1-15-17, Nanpeidai Takatsuki-shi Osaka 569 / JP | [1997/22] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1997/22] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwälte, von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 95927994.4 | 09.08.1995 | [1997/22] | WO1995JP01580 | Priority number, date | JP19940187300 | 09.08.1994 Original published format: JP 18730094 | JP19940262128 | 26.10.1994 Original published format: JP 26212894 | [1997/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9605359 | Date: | 22.02.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0775773 | Date: | 28.05.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.02.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | D06M17/04, A41D27/06, C09J9/00, C09J201/00, C09J177/00, C09J167/00 | [1997/22] | CPC: |
A41D27/06 (EP,KR);
C09J177/00 (EP);
D06M10/10 (EP);
D06M13/352 (EP);
D06M17/04 (EP,KR);
D06M17/08 (EP);
D06M23/16 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, LI, NL [1997/22] | Title | German: | KLEBENDES POLSTERMATERIAL, VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG UND BINDEMITTEL FÜR POLSTERUNGEN | [1997/22] | English: | ADHESIVE PADDING CLOTH, METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME AND BONDING AGENT FOR ADHESIVE CLOTHS | [1997/22] | French: | TISSU ADHESIF DE REMBOURRAGE, SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ET COLLE POUR TISSUS ADHESIFS | [1997/22] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.1997 | Translation filed | 05.02.1997 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.1997 | Search fee paid | 05.02.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 05.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/22] | 13.08.1998 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1998/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1998 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1463900 (UNITIKA LTD) [X] 11,12 * examples 1,3 *; | [X]GB1411966 (UNITIKA LTD) [X] 11,12 * example - * | International search | [XP]JPH0711585 (KOTEC KK); | [A]JPH04316682 (PICARDIE LAINIERE); | [A]JPS57128248 (FREUDENBERG CARL); | [A]JPH01141722U | by applicant | JPS5655206 | JPH04316682 | JPH05230771 | JPS6317147B | JPH02133678 |