EP0724382 - A CONSTRUCTION INCLUDING AN IMPLEMENT FOR MILKING ANIMALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 14.09.2009 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAASLAND N.V. Weverskade 10 3155 PD Maasland / NL | [2003/02] |
Former [1996/32] | For all designated states MAASLAND N.V. Weverskade 10 NL-3155 PD Maasland / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DER LELY, Cornelis Brüschenrain 7 CH-6300 Zug / CH | 02 /
VAN DEN BERG, Karel Boterbloemstraat 5 NL-2971 BR Bleskensgraaf / NL | [2003/01] |
Former [1996/32] | 01 /
VAN DER LELY, Cornelis Brüschenrain 7 CH-6300 Zug / CH | ||
02 /
VAND DEN BERG, Karel Boterbloemstraat 5 NL-2971 BR Bleskensgraaf / NL | Representative(s) | Corten, Maurice Jean F.M., et al Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Cornelis van der Lelylaan 1 3147 PB Maassluis / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/48] | Corten, Maurice Jean F.M., et al Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 3155 PD Maasland / NL | ||
Former [1996/32] | Mulder, Herman, et al Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 3155 PD Maasland / NL | Application number, filing date | 95928039.7 | 21.08.1995 | [1996/32] | WO1995NL00278 | Priority number, date | NL19940001358 | 23.08.1994 Original published format: NL 9401358 | NL19940001801 | 31.10.1994 Original published format: NL 9401801 | [1996/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9605723 | Date: | 29.02.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0724382 | Date: | 07.08.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.02.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0724382 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/02] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0724382 | Date: | 14.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A01J5/017, A01K5/02 | [1996/32] | CPC: |
A01K5/02 (EP,US);
A01J5/0175 (EP,US);
A01K5/0275 (EP,US);
A01K5/0283 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1996/32] | Title | German: | KONSTRUKTION MIT GERÄT ZUM MELKEN VON TIEREN | [1996/32] | English: | A CONSTRUCTION INCLUDING AN IMPLEMENT FOR MILKING ANIMALS | [1996/32] | French: | INSTALLATION COMPRENANT UN EQUIPEMENT POUR LA TRAITE D'ANIMAUX | [1996/32] | Entry into regional phase | 09.05.1996 | National basic fee paid | 09.05.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.05.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/32] | 20.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 09.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP02076432.0 / EP1224856 | EP02076433.8 / EP1224857 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.10.2003
21.10.2003
ADMISSIBLE GEA WestfaliaSurge GmbH Siemensstrasse 25-27 59199 Bönen / DE Opponent's representative Schütte, Hartmut BSB Anwaltskanzlei Am Markt 2 Eingang Herrenstraße 59302 Oelde / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.10.2003
21.10.2003
ADMISSIBLE GEA WestfaliaSurge GmbH Siemensstrasse 25-27 59199 Bönen / DE Opponent's representative Schütte, Hartmut BSB Anwaltskanzlei Am Markt 2 (Eingang Herrenstrasse) 59302 Oelde / DE | ||
Former [2008/51] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.10.2003
21.10.2003
ADMISSIBLE GEA WestfaliaSurge GmbH Siemensstrasse 25-27 59199 Bönen / DE Opponent's representative Schütte, Hartmut Patentanwalt Beethovenstrasse 34 59302 Oelde / DE | ||
Former [2006/06] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.10.2003
21.10.2003
ADMISSIBLE WestfaliaSurge GmbH Siemensstr. 25-27 59199 Bönen / DE Opponent's representative Schütte, Hartmut Patentanwalt Beethovenstrasse 34 59302 Oelde / DE | ||
Former [2005/41] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.10.2003
21.10.2003
ADMISSIBLE WestfaliaSurge GmbH Werner-Habig-Str. 1 59302 Oelde / DE Opponent's representative Schütte, Hartmut Patentanwalt, Beethovenstrasse 34 59302 Oelde / DE | ||
Former [2003/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.10.2003
WestfaliaSurge GmbH Werner-Habig-Str. 1 59302 Oelde / DE | 20.11.2003 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 05.03.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.09.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.10.2005 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 24.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 05.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 18.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 11.03.2009 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.03.2009 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 02.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 27.08.2009 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 29.11.2005 | Appeal received No. T1478/05 | 01.03.2006 | Statement of grounds filed | 09.10.2007 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure | 09.10.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.10.2007 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Request for further processing for: | 18.10.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 18.10.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.10.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 08.01.2003 | [2004/10] | Cited in | International search | [YA]GB1031245 (CLAY EQUIPMENT CORP) [Y] 1,35 * page 1, line 14 - line 55 * * page 3, line 40 - line 120 * * figure -; claims 1,2 * [A] 12,13; | [YA]EP0091892 (ALFA LAVAL AB [SE]) [Y] 1,35 * page 2, line 21 - line 31 * * page 5, line 24 - line 28 * * figure 1; claims 1,5 * [A] 18; | [PA]EP0630560 (LELY NV C VAN DER [NL]) [PA] 1,18,35 * column 2, line 1 - line 38; figure 1 *; | [YA]EP0332229 (LELY NV C VAN DER [NL]) [Y] 2,19,35 * column 3, line 1 - line 27 * * column 3, line 28 - line 38 * * column 4, line 6 - line 16 * * figure -; claims 1,5,6 * [A] 1,17; | [YA]GB2190574 (BRISBY IAN ROBERT) [Y] 2,19,35 * page 1, line 66 - line 78 * * page 3, line 90 - page 4, line 15 * * figure -; claims 1,2,10 * [A] 20-23; | [A]NL9200095 (LELY NV C VAN DER) [A] 2,19,35,1 * page 3, line 7 - page 4, line 8 *; | [A]NL9200095 ; | [A]US4735171 (ESSEX JAMES O [US]) [A] 2,35 * column 1, line 17 - line 24 * * Abstract * * figure -; claims 1-4 *; | [A]FR2507435 (TELEMECANIQUE ELECTRIQUE [FR]) [A] 2,20-23,35 * claims 1,7,8 *; | [A]FR2623688 (PATUREL ERIC [FR]) [A] 2,19-21,35 * page 1, paragraph 4 - page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 3, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP0395179 (PROLION DEV [NL]) [A] 2,12,16-19,35 * column 2, line 35 - column 3, line 34 * * figure -; claim - * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 36, Database accession no. 93-285894, & NL9200095 A 00000000 (VAN DER LELY) [A] 1,2,19,35 * abstract * |