EP0722292 - DEVICE FOR INSERTING A FLEXIBLE INTRAOCULAR LENS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.05.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAUSCH & LOMB INCORPORATED One Bausch & Lomb Square Rochester, NY 14604-2701 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/17] | For all designated states Bausch & Lomb Incorporated 555 West Arrow Highway Claremont, CA 91711 / US | ||
Former [1996/30] | For all designated states CHIRON VISION CORPORATION 555 West Arrow Highway Claremont, CA 91711 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FIGUEROA, Dennis, Alexander 26382 Alhondra Mission Viejo, CA 92691 / US | 02 /
NIGAM, Alok 21381 Birdhollow Drive Trabuco Cyn, CA 92679 / US | 03 /
HEYMAN, Thomas, Michael 15019 Turtle Pond Court Chino Hills, CA 91709 / US | 04 /
OVIATT, Henry, W., Jr. 26795 Bridgeton Mission Viejo, CA 92692 / US | [1996/30] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/30] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95928333.4 | 07.08.1995 | [1996/30] | WO1995US09973 | Priority number, date | US19940286557 | 05.08.1994 Original published format: US 286557 | [1996/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9603924 | Date: | 15.02.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0722292 | Date: | 24.07.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0722292 | Date: | 16.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.02.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/00 | [1996/30] | CPC: |
A61F2/1678 (EP,US);
A61F2/167 (EP,US);
A61F2/1691 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LU, NL, SE [1996/30] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM EINSETZEN EINER FLEXIBLEN INTRAOKULAREN LINSE | [1996/30] | English: | DEVICE FOR INSERTING A FLEXIBLE INTRAOCULAR LENS | [1996/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR L'INSERTION D'UNE LENTILLE INTRAOCULAIRE SOUPLE | [1996/30] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.1996 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.1996 | Search fee paid | 25.04.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/41] | 31.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 22.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03006748.2 / EP1338254 | Opposition(s) | 19.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 16.07.2003 | IE | 07.08.2003 | LU | 07.08.2003 | [2004/40] |
Former [2004/39] | BE | 16.07.2003 | |
LU | 07.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | BE | 16.07.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [XY]US5275604 (RHEINISH ROBERT S [US], et al); | [Y]US4919130 (STOY MICHAEL A [US], et al); | [Y]US4765329 (CUMMING J STUART [US], et al) |