EP0785977 - FABRIC SOFTENING COMPOSITION CONTAINING CHLORINE SCAVENGERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.12.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/31] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRINH, Toan 8671 Creekwood Lane Maineville, OH 45039 / US | 02 /
SWARTLEY, Donald, Marion 661 Heavenly Lane Cincinnati, OH 45238 / US | [1997/31] | Representative(s) | Morelle, Evelyne Charlotte Isabelle, et al N.V. Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/09] | Morelle, Evelyne Charlotte Isabelle, et al N.V. Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | ||
Former [1997/31] | Mather, Peter Geoffrey, et al Procter & Gamble European Technical Center N.V. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 95928370.6 | 08.08.1995 | [1997/31] | WO1995US10129 | Priority number, date | US19940320475 | 07.10.1994 Original published format: US 320475 | [1997/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9611248 | Date: | 18.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0785977 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/62, C11D3/30, C11D3/33, C11D3/37 | [1997/31] | CPC: |
C11D3/046 (EP,US);
C11D1/62 (EP,US);
C11D3/001 (EP,US);
C11D3/0015 (EP,US);
C11D3/30 (EP,US);
C11D3/33 (EP,US);
C11D3/3719 (EP,US);
C11D3/3723 (EP,US);
C11D3/3769 (EP,US);
C11D3/3776 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1997/31] | Title | German: | WÄSCHEMACHERZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT CHLORFÄNGER | [1997/31] | English: | FABRIC SOFTENING COMPOSITION CONTAINING CHLORINE SCAVENGERS | [1997/31] | French: | ASSOUPLISSANTS CONTENANT DES DESTRUCTEURS DE CHLORE | [1997/31] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.1997 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/31] | 28.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2004/06] | 10.12.2003 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2004/06] | Appeal following examination | 14.12.2001 | Appeal received No. T0772/02 | 13.03.2002 | Statement of grounds filed | 16.04.2003 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2003/16] | 21.08.2003 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2003/34] | 10.12.2003 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3893954 (TIVIN FRED, et al) [A] 1-10 * column W *; | [A]EP0086423 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] 1-10 * claim - *; | [A]EP0293055 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] * claim - *; | [A]WO9117234 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 2, line 35 - page 6, line 29 * * page 9, line 31 - line 32; claim - *; | [PA]WO9505442 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [PA] 1-10 * page 19, line 4 - page 21, line 26 ** page 23, line 3 - page 25, line 20; claim - * |