EP0776357 - OIL MODIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | For:BE
DE
DK
ES
FR
NL
PT
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:BE
DE
DK
ES
FR
NL
PT
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [1999/34] | For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:BE
DE
DK
ES
FR
NL
PT
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [1999/33] | For all designated states UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For all designated states UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [1997/23] | For all designated states QUEST INTERNATIONAL B.V. Huizerstraatweg 28 1411 GP Naarden / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARRIS, John Bernard 20 Colworth Road Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1ET / GB | 02 /
KEULEMANS, Cornelius Nicholaas M. Zwanenburg 8 3181 SV Rozenburg / NL | 03 /
MILTON, Leslie Alan Eemwijkplein 24 2271 RB Voorburg / NL | 04 /
ROEST, Erwin J.G. Spijtstraat 7 1531 EA Wormer / NL | [1997/23] | Representative(s) | Dekker, Enno Ernst Jan, et al Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1997/23] | Dekker, Enno E.J., et al Unilever N.V. Patents Division P.O. Box 137 3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | Application number, filing date | 95928497.7 | 28.07.1995 | [1997/23] | WO1995EP03035 | Priority number, date | EP19940306056 | 17.08.1994 Original published format: EP 94306056 | [1997/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9605279 | Date: | 22.02.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0776357 | Date: | 04.06.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0776357 | Date: | 08.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C11B7/00 | [1997/23] | CPC: |
C11B7/0075 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, NL, PT, SE [1997/23] | Title | German: | MODIFIZIERUNG VON ÖLEN | [1997/23] | English: | OIL MODIFICATION | [1997/23] | French: | MODIFICATION DE L'HUILE | [1997/23] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.1997 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/23] | 14.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.08.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4161484 (BERG HENDRIKUS J VAN DEN [NL]) [A] 1-7 * column 2, line 25 - column 3, line 21 * * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 62 * * example 3 *; | [A]GB2180253 (ALFA LAVAL FOOD & DAIRY ENG) [A] 1-7 * claims 1-9 *; | [A]EP0262113 (TIRTIAUX FRACTIONNEMENT [BE]) [A] 1-7 * claims 1-3 *; | [A]EP0535475 (KRUPP MASCHINENTECHNIK [DE]) [A] 1-7 * page 4, column 5, line 51 - page 7, column 12, line 54 * * examples 1-3 * * claims 1-28 *; | [A]GB2270925 (PALL CORP [US]) [A] 1-7 * page 19, line 34 - page 20, line 12 ** claim 1 * | [A] - JAMES H. WHITTAM ET AL., "Etude microscopique du vieillissement de la tripalmitine", REVUE FRANCAISE DES CORPS GRAS, PARIS FR, (1974), vol. 21, no. 11, pages 605 - 610 [A] 1 * the whole document * |