EP0777089 - A METHOD OF PREPARING A REGENERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/23] | COLD HEAT ACCUMULATING MATERIAL FOR EXTREMELY LOW TEMPERATURES AND COLD HEAT ACCUMULATOR FOR EXTREMELY LOW TEMPERATURES USING THE SAME | ||
[2007/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | ||
Former [1997/23] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKAMURA, Masami 1950-49-4-404, Mutsuura-cho Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 236 / JP | 02 /
SORI, Naoyuki 1-12, Tanaka Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 235 / JP | [1997/23] | Representative(s) | March, Gary Clifford, et al Batchellor, Kirk & Co. 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/23] | March, Gary Clifford, et al Batchellor, Kirk & Co. 2 Pear Tree Court Farringdon Road London EC1R 0DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 95928629.5 | 22.08.1995 | [1997/23] | WO1995JP01653 | Priority number, date | JP19940198347 | 23.08.1994 Original published format: JP 19834794 | JP19940320366 | 22.12.1994 Original published format: JP 32036694 | [1997/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9606315 | Date: | 29.02.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0777089 | Date: | 04.06.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.02.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0777089 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.02.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F25B9/00 | [1997/23] | CPC: |
F25B9/14 (EP,US);
F25B2309/003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [1997/23] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR REGENERATORHERSTELLUNG | [2007/32] | English: | A METHOD OF PREPARING A REGENERATOR | [2007/32] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN REGENERATEUR | [2007/32] |
Former [1997/23] | KÄLTESPEICHERSTOFF FÜR TIEFSTTEMPERATUREN UND DENSELBEN VERWENDENDER KÄLTESPEICHER FÜR TIEFSTTEMPERATUREN | ||
Former [1997/23] | COLD HEAT ACCUMULATING MATERIAL FOR EXTREMELY LOW TEMPERATURES AND COLD HEAT ACCUMULATOR FOR EXTREMELY LOW TEMPERATURES USING THE SAME | ||
Former [1997/23] | MATERIAU ACCUMULANT LA CHALEUR FROIDE POUR TEMPERATURES EXTREMEMENT BASSES, ET ACCUMULATEUR DE CHALEUR FROIDE POUR TEMPERATURES EXTREMEMENT BASSES COMPRENANT LEDIT MATERIAU | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.1997 | Translation filed | 18.03.1997 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.1997 | Search fee paid | 18.03.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 18.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/23] | 15.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.12.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 21.12.2004 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 13.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 16.02.2005 | Appeal received No. T0683/05 | 21.04.2005 | Statement of grounds filed | 25.04.2007 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | Divisional application(s) | EP03024192.1 / EP1384961 | Opposition(s) | 09.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPH01310269 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JPH02309159 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JPH03174486 (TOSHIBA CORP) |