EP0775134 - Imidazolin-2-ylaminobenzimidazole derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/22] | NOVEL BENZIMIDAZOLE DERIVATIVES | ||
[1997/30] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.07.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.09.2005 [2005/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SYNAPTIC PHARMACEUTICAL CORPORATION 215 College Road Paramus New Jersey 07652-1410 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/22] | For all designated states SYNAPTIC PHARMACEUTICAL CORPORATION 215 College Road Paramus, New Jersey 07652-1410 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JEON, Yoon, T. 411 Ponfield Place Ridgewood, NJ 07450 / US | 02 /
GLUCHOWSKI, Charles 153 Chopin Drive Wayne, NJ 07470 / US | [1997/22] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/22] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95928743.4 | 04.08.1995 | [1997/22] | WO1995US09895 | Priority number, date | US19940285956 | 04.08.1994 Original published format: US 285956 | [1997/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9604270 | Date: | 15.02.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0775134 | Date: | 28.05.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.02.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07D403/02, A61K31/415, C07D403/04, // (C07D403/04, 235:00, 233:00) | [1997/30] | CPC: |
C07D403/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/22] | C07D403/02, A61K31/415 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/22] | Title | German: | Imidazolin-2-Ylaminobenzimidazolderivate | [1997/30] | English: | Imidazolin-2-ylaminobenzimidazole derivatives | [1997/30] | French: | Dérivés de l'imidazolin-2-ylaminobenzimidazole | [1997/30] |
Former [1997/22] | NEUE BENZIMIDAZOLDERIVATE | ||
Former [1997/22] | NOVEL BENZIMIDAZOLE DERIVATIVES | ||
Former [1997/22] | NOUVEAUX DERIVES DE BENZIMIDAZOLE | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.1997 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.1997 | Search fee paid | 04.03.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 04.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/22] | 08.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 16.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/36] | 06.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YP]DE4325491 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM KG [DE]) [YP] 1,12 * page 8, line 15 - line 20 *; | [Y]WO9221349 (ALLERGAN INC [US]) [Y] 1,12 * page 9 - page 10 *; | [Y]FR2181776 (PFIZER [PA], et al) [Y] 1,12 * examples 10-20 *; | [Y]EP0129153 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM KG [DE]) [Y] 1,12 * example 6 *; | [Y]EP0070084 (BEECHAM GROUP PLC [GB]) [Y] 1,12 * pages 11 and 23 *; | [Y]DE2854659 (BOEHRINGER SOHN INGELHEIM) [Y] 1,12 * example 5 *; | [A]EP0029505 (BOEHRINGER SOHN INGELHEIM [DE]) [A] 1,12 * abstract * | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19890717), vol. 111, no. 3, Database accession no. 23456c, XP002031706 [Y] 1,12 * abstract * | [ ] - C.B. CHAPLEO ET AL., JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, WASHINGTON US, (1989), vol. 32, no. 7, pages 1627 - 1630 | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19800428), vol. 92, no. 17, Database accession no. 146358u, XP002031707 [Y] 1,12 * abstract * | [ ] - B. ROUOT ET AL., BULLETIN DE LA SOCIETE CHIMIQUE DE FRANCE, PARIS FR, (1979), vol. 9-10, no. 2, pages 520 - 528 | International search | [X]EP0399791 (ALLERGAN INC [US]); | [X]GB1410017 (BEECHAM GROUP LTD) |