EP0789635 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REMOVING DUST PARTICLES FROM A RELATIVELY MOVING MATERIAL WEB [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/34] | REMOVING DUST PARTICLES FROM A RELATIVELY MOVING MATERIAL WEB | ||
[1999/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2000 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Patent Consulting & Development GmbH Oberer Rebbergweg 115 4153 Reinach/BL / CH | [1999/13] |
Former [1998/17] | For all designated states Schneider, Robert Nicolas Armand Oberer Rebbergweg 115 4153 Reinach BL1 / CH | ||
Former [1997/34] | For all designated states Schneider, Robert, Nicolas, Armand Schafmattweg 87 Postfach 965 4102 Binningen 2 / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schneider, Robert Oberer Rebbergweg 115 4153 Reinach / CH | [1999/13] |
Former [1997/34] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1998/17] |
Former [1997/34] | Keller, René, Dr. Keller & Partner Patentanwälte AG Marktgasse 31 Postfach 3000 Bern 7 / CH | Application number, filing date | 95928936.4 | 06.09.1995 | [1997/34] | WO1995CH00196 | Priority number, date | CH19940002719 | 06.09.1994 Original published format: CH 271994 | CH19950001302 | 05.05.1995 Original published format: CH 130295 | [1997/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9607490 | Date: | 14.03.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0789635 | Date: | 20.08.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0789635 | Date: | 11.08.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B08B6/00, B08B5/02 | [1997/34] | CPC: |
B08B6/00 (EP,US);
B08B5/026 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/34] | Extension states | LT | 27.03.1997 | LV | 27.03.1997 | SI | 27.03.1997 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ENTFERNEN VON STAUBPARTIKELN VON EINER RELATIV BEWEGTEN MATERIALBAHN | [1999/32] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REMOVING DUST PARTICLES FROM A RELATIVELY MOVING MATERIAL WEB | [1999/32] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR L'ENLEVEMENT DE PARTICULES DE POUSSIERE SUR UNE BANDE DE MATERIAU EN MOUVEMENT RELATIF | [1999/32] |
Former [1997/34] | ENTFERNEN VON STAUBPARTIKELN VON EINER RELATIV BEWEGTEN MATERIALBAHN | ||
Former [1997/34] | REMOVING DUST PARTICLES FROM A RELATIVELY MOVING MATERIAL WEB | ||
Former [1997/34] | ENLEVEMENT DE PARTICULES DE POUSSIERE SUR UNE BANDE DE MATERIAU EN MOUVEMENT RELATIF | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.1997 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.04.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/34] | 27.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.07.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1998 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   10.03.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 11.08.1999 | IE | 11.08.1999 | IT | 11.08.1999 | NL | 11.08.1999 | CH | 30.09.1999 | LI | 30.09.1999 | DK | 11.11.1999 | PT | 11.11.1999 | MC | 31.03.2000 | [2008/06] |
Former [2003/45] | GR | 11.08.1999 | |
IE | 11.08.1999 | ||
NL | 11.08.1999 | ||
CH | 30.09.1999 | ||
LI | 30.09.1999 | ||
DK | 11.11.1999 | ||
PT | 11.11.1999 | ||
MC | 31.03.2000 | ||
Former [2003/18] | GR | 11.08.1999 | |
IE | 11.08.1999 | ||
NL | 11.08.1999 | ||
CH | 30.09.1999 | ||
LI | 30.09.1999 | ||
PT | 11.11.1999 | ||
MC | 31.03.2000 | ||
Former [2003/17] | GR | 11.08.1999 | |
IE | 11.08.1999 | ||
NL | 11.08.1999 | ||
CH | 30.09.1999 | ||
LI | 30.09.1999 | ||
MC | 11.10.1999 | ||
PT | 11.11.1999 | ||
Former [2003/09] | GR | 11.08.1999 | |
IE | 11.08.1999 | ||
NL | 11.08.1999 | ||
CH | 30.09.1999 | ||
LI | 30.09.1999 | ||
PT | 11.11.1999 | ||
MC | 31.03.2000 | ||
Former [2001/23] | GR | 11.08.1999 | |
IE | 11.08.1999 | ||
CH | 30.09.1999 | ||
LI | 30.09.1999 | ||
PT | 11.11.1999 | ||
MC | 31.03.2000 | ||
Former [2001/12] | IE | 11.08.1999 | |
CH | 30.09.1999 | ||
LI | 30.09.1999 | ||
PT | 11.11.1999 | ||
MC | 31.03.2000 | ||
Former [2000/52] | CH | 30.09.1999 | |
LI | 30.09.1999 | ||
PT | 11.11.1999 | ||
MC | 31.03.2000 | ||
Former [2000/50] | PT | 11.11.1999 | |
CH | 21.04.2000 | ||
LI | 21.04.2000 | ||
Former [2000/26] | PT | 11.11.1999 | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0245526 (ELTEX ELEKTROSTATIK GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1-3,6 * column W *; | [A]EP0279109 (SHAPE INC [US]) [A] 1,3,6,13 * claims 1-17 *; | [DA]DE4215602 (SUNDWIGER EISEN MASCHINEN [DE]) [DA] 2,4,6-9 * column 3, line 6 - column 4, line 4; claim 1 *; | [A]DE4305907 (SUNDWIGER EISEN MASCHINEN [DE]) [A] 2,6,7,9,13* column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 58 * |