EP0773714 - COLLAR FOR RESTRAINING AND LEADING ANIMALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.1999 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.09.1999 [1999/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koch, Heinrich Robert-Bosch-Strasse 9 86899 Landsberg am Lech / DE | [1997/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/21] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/21] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95929033.9 | 31.07.1995 | [1997/21] | WO1995EP03050 | Priority number, date | DE19940012361U | 01.08.1994 Original published format: DE 9412361 U | [1997/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9603865 | Date: | 15.02.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0773714 | Date: | 21.05.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0773714 | Date: | 07.10.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A01K27/00 | [1997/21] | CPC: |
A01K27/001 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1997/21] | Title | German: | HALSGURT ZUM HALTEN UND FÜHREN VON TIEREN | [1997/21] | English: | COLLAR FOR RESTRAINING AND LEADING ANIMALS | [1997/21] | French: | COLLIER POUR RETENIR ET GUIDER DES ANIMAUX | [1997/21] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.1997 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/21] | 17.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB980863 (CHEETHAM W H & SONS); | [A]US4426957 (HORRIGAN RICHARD [US]); | [AD]DE3925548 (BLOMANN ULRICH [DE], et al) [AD] 1 * the whole document * |