EP0726409 - DYNAMIC DAMPER AND MOLDING MATERIAL THEREFOR AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.05.1998 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.1998 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.07.1998 [1998/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOKAI RUBBER INDUSTRIES, LTD. 3600, Aza-Utazu Oaza-Kitatoyama Komaki-shi Aichi 485 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/33] | For all designated states TOKAI RUBBER INDUSTRIES, LTD. 3600, Aza-Utazu Oaza-Kitatoyama Komaki-shi Aichi 485 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAMADA, Masaaki, Tokai Rubber Industries, Ltd. 3600, Aza-Utazu, Oaza-Kitatoyama Komaki-shi, Aichi 485 / JP | 02 /
AOI, Takahiro, Tokai Rubber Industries, Ltd. 3600, Aza-Utazu, Oaza-Kitatoyama Komaki-shi, Aichi 485 / JP | [1996/33] | Representative(s) | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/33] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95929236.8 | 25.08.1995 | [1996/33] | WO1995JP01701 | Priority number, date | JP19940203627 | 29.08.1994 Original published format: JP 20362794 | [1996/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9607036 | Date: | 07.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0726409 | Date: | 14.08.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.03.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F16F7/108, B29C35/02, C08L21/00, F16F15/12 | [1997/11] | CPC: |
F16F7/108 (EP);
F16F15/02 (KR);
F16F15/30 (KR);
B60G2202/25 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1996/33] | F16F15/02, F16F15/30, C08L21/00, B29C35/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/33] | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHER DÄMPFER, SOWIE GIESSMATERIAL UND FERTIGUNGSMETHODE DAFÜR | [1996/33] | English: | DYNAMIC DAMPER AND MOLDING MATERIAL THEREFOR AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME | [1996/33] | French: | AMORTISSEUR DYNAMIQUE, MATERIAU DE MOULAGE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE L'AMORTISSEUR | [1996/33] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.1996 | Translation filed | 25.04.1996 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.1996 | Search fee paid | 25.04.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/33] | 25.05.1998 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1998/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE3641384 (HORNSCHUCH AG K [DE]) [X] 1,3-5,8-12,15 * the whole document * * claim 1 * [A] 13,14; | [X]EP0198649 (MELLES GRIOT IRVINE COMPANY [US]) [X] 1-5,8,9 * the whole document *; | [A]US5156371 (SAMAROV VICTOR M [US]) [A] 1-3,8 * abstract * * column 5, line 60 - column 5, line 11; figure 5 *; | [A]EP0356917 (TOKAI RUBBER IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1,10,12 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPH04316741 (TOYODA GOSEI KK); | [A]JPH05310993 (KYOWA KK); | [A]JPH0469422 (KOBE STEEL LTD) |