EP0774919 - GAS COLUMN PRESSURE-MONITORING CATHETERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 28.05.2014 [2014/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INNERSPACE, INC. 2855 S. Pullman Street Santa Ana, CA 92705 / US | [1997/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOBO, Donald, E. 18623 Santa Isadora Fountain Valley, CA 92708 / US | [1997/22] | Representative(s) | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/09] | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/22] | Baillie, Iain Cameron c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95929410.9 | 07.08.1995 | [1997/22] | WO1995US10014 | Priority number, date | US19940287195 | 08.08.1994 Original published format: US 287195 | [1997/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9604846 | Date: | 22.02.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0774919 | Date: | 28.05.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0774919 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.02.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/103, A61B5/0215, A61B5/03 | [1999/10] | CPC: |
A61B5/031 (EP,US);
A61B5/0215 (EP,US);
A61B5/035 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0003 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/22] | A61B5/103 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/22] | Title | German: | GASKOLUMNEN-DRUCKKONTROLLKATHETER | [1997/22] | English: | GAS COLUMN PRESSURE-MONITORING CATHETERS | [1997/22] | French: | CATHETERS DE MESURE DE PRESSION A COLONNE DE GAZ | [1997/22] | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.1997 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.1997 | Search fee paid | 03.03.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 03.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/22] | 07.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 03.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2004/02] | DE | 07.02.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [XDY]WO8603957 (SPIEGELBERG ANDREAS [DE]) [XD] 1,2,6,8 * page 1, line 1 - line 32 * * page 4, line 24 - page 6, line 1; figure -; claim - * [Y] 4,9,10; | [Y]US4543965 (PACK ISAK [IL], et al) [Y] 4,9,10 * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 26; figure - *; | [X]DE4340772 (PRZED WIELOBRANEOWE MED FROZ S [PL]) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 5 - line 46; figure - * * abstract *; | [A]US3738356 (WORKMAN H) [A] 1 * column 2, line 46 - column 4, line 68; figure -; claim - *; | [A]WO9011717 (UTAH MEDICAL PRODUCTS INC [US]) [A] 1 * page 10, line 12 - page 13, line 28; figures 1-3 * * abstract *; | [A]EP0224252 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US5263485 (HICKEY DONALD D [US]); | [Y]US4981470 (BOMBECK IV C THOMAS [US]); | [A]US4543965 (PACK ISAK [IL], et al) | by applicant | US2840069 | US4227420 | US4300571 | US4314480 | US4648406 | US4841984 | US5105820 | US5279308 | WO8202657 | WO8603957 | WO9011717 |