EP0774916 - ENDOSCOPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.07.2001 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.09.2001 [2001/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMAGYN MEDICAL, INC. 27651 La Paz Road Laguna Niguel California 92677 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/43] | For all designated states IMAGYN MEDICAL, INC. 27651 La Paz Road Laguna Niguel, California 92677 / US | ||
Former [1997/22] | For all designated states IMAGYN MEDICAL, INC. 27651 LaPaz Road Laguna Niguel, California 92656-3917 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QUICK, Richard, L. 32181 Fall River Road Trabuco Canyon, CA 92678 / US | 02 /
FORKNER, John, F. 31661 Florence Avenue South Laguna, CA 92677 / US | 03 /
WOKER, Gary, M. 2845 Julinda Way Escondido, CA 92029 / US | [1997/22] | Representative(s) | Enskat, Michael Antony Frank, et al Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford WD18 0JU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/22] | Enskat, Michael Antony Frank, et al Saunders & Dolleymore, 9, Rickmansworth Road Watford, Hertfordshire WD1 7HE / GB | Application number, filing date | 95929490.1 | 11.08.1995 | [1997/22] | WO1995US10258 | Priority number, date | US19940289932 | 12.08.1994 Original published format: US 289932 | [1997/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9605764 | Date: | 29.02.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0774916 | Date: | 28.05.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.02.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.04.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/06, A61B1/00, G02B23/26 | [1997/41] | CPC: |
G02B23/26 (EP,US);
A61B1/00165 (EP,US);
A61B1/00195 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/22] | A61B1/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/22] | Title | German: | ENDOSKOP | [1997/22] | English: | ENDOSCOPE | [1997/22] | French: | ENDOSCOPE | [1997/22] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.1997 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.1997 | Search fee paid | 06.03.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 06.03.1997 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/22] | 01.03.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/37] | 09.04.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2000 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3081767 (HETT JOHN H) [A] 1,2,16* column 2, line 59 - column 4, line 7; tables 1-5 *; | [A]FR2317673 (WOLF GMBH RICHARD [DE]) [A] 1,10-12,14 * page 2, line 3 - page 3, line 9; table 2 *; | [A]WO8605964 (BAXTER TRAVENOL LAB [US]) [A] 1-3,7,9,11 * page 10, line 16 - page 11, line 30; tables 2,3 * | International search | [Y]US2975785 (SHELDON GILBERT J); | [Y]EP0122713 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO [JP]); | [X]US4776668 (FUJIMOTO ISAO [US]); | [Y]GB2245718 (SMITHS INDUSTRIES PLC [GB]); | [Y]US5199417 (MULLER RICHARD P [US], et al); | [Y]US5304171 (GREGORY KENTON W [US], et al) |